Bohlen et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02797 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-03311 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 26, 2021 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS BOHLEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMARA BOHLEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/29 2:08 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TOLLING AGREEMENT TOLLING OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BASF CORPORATION This Order Relates To: The Court GRANTSthe motion 4484 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (24) in case 2:20-cv-00279-RMG; (24) in case 2:20-cv-00358-RMG; (23) in case 2:20-cv-00496-RMG; (23) in case 2:20-cv-00599-RMG; (23) in case 2:20-cv-00644-RMG; (20) in case 2:20-cv-02717-RMG; (20) in case 2:20-cv-02796-RMG; (20) in case 2:20-cv-02797-RMG; (17) in case 2:20-cv-02798-RMG) and enters the Tolling Agreement. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/29/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/14 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION Entry of Tolling Agreement of Claims Against BASF Corporation by Ellen Jaekel, Maryann P Maher, Thomas Maher, Gary Talvacchio, COLLEEN KOH, NICHOLAS BOHLEN, TAMARA BOHLEN, DENNIS PALMER, SANDRA L. PALMER, Christopher M Gaida, Niloosar Khalif, Yuri Khalif, EDITH COMUSO, ANTHONY COMUSO. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Christensen, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Tolling Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Tolling Agreement | ||
Wednesday, July 27, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/27 10:10 AM
ORDER TOLLING OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BASF CORPORATION This Order Relates To: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion 2490 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (22) in case 2:20-cv-00279-RMG; (22) in case 2:20-cv-00358-RMG; (21) in case 2:20-cv-00496-RMG; (21) in case 2:20-cv-00599-RMG; (21) in case 2:20-cv-00644-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-02717-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-02796-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-02797-RMG; (15) in case 2:20-cv-02798-RMG) and enters the tolling agreement. See Tolling Agreement for Recitals and Terms. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/27/22.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/25 9:19 PM
Joint MOTION For Entry of Tolling Agreement of Claims Against BASF Corporation by Ellen Jaekel, Maryann P Maher, Thomas Maher, Gary Talvacchio, COLLEEN KOH, NICHOLAS BOHLEN, TAMARA BOHLEN, DENNIS PALMER, SANDRA L. PALMER, Christopher M Gaida, Niloosar Khalif, Yuri Khalif, EDITH COMUSO, ANTHONY COMUSO. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Christensen, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order For Joint Motion For Entry of Tolling Agreement of Claims Against BASF Corporation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/20 4:57 PM
ORDER This Order Relates To Case Nos. as listed on Exhibit A regarding TOLLING OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BASF CORPORATION granting 1493 Motion for entry of Tolling Agreement (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (19) in case 2:20-cv-00279-RMG; (19) in case 2:20-cv-00358-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-00496-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-00599-RMG; (18) in case 2:20-cv-00644-RMG; (15) in case 2:20-cv-02717-RMG; (15) in case 2:20-cv-02796-RMG; (15) in case 2:20-cv-02797-RMG; (12) in case 2:20-cv-02798-RMG). See Order for Terms and details. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/20/2021.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/08 4:21 PM
MOTION Entry of Tolling Agreement of Claims Against BASF Corporation by Ellen Jaekel, Maryann P Maher, Thomas Maher, Gary Talvacchio, COLLEEN KOH, NICHOLAS BOHLEN, TAMARA BOHLEN, DENNIS PALMER, SANDRA L. PALMER, Christopher M Gaida, Niloosar Khalif, Yuri Khalif, EDITH COMUSO, ANTHONY COMUSO. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Christensen, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 (Proposed) Tolling Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to (Proposed) Tolling Agreement | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/30 10:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NICHOLAS BOHLEN, TAMARA BOHLEN re4 Clerk Staff Notes, (Christensen, Nancy) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Other
Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/02 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/30 9:22 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-03311, Bohlen et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-2797-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/30 9:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03311. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-33) THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 TO THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH CAROLINA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 12/7/18 AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD M. GERGEL. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.] | |
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County.(afm, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 demand for jury, | ||
Att: 3 entry of appearance, | ||
Att: 4 notice of removal | ||
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/13/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.] | |
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14402943), from the Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County Case No. 2020-06628 filed by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 7/7/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service |