Puckett v. Chesley Brown Companies, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John K Larkins, III |
Referred: | John K Larkins, III |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03215 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 30, 2021 5:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Chesley Brown Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chesley Brown International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Felita Davis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Greene
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ricky Muse (sp.)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Demond Antonio Puckett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 05/06 9:16 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING45 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (tcc) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 05/06 9:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tcc) |
||
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice Attached by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
![]() ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (rvb) (ADI) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
![]() Initial Disclosures by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc., Chesley Brown International, Inc., Felita Davis, Jeff Greene, Ricky Muse (sp.).(Olson, Carey) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
42 | 42
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc., Chesley Brown International, Inc..(Olson, Carey) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
![]() ORDER granting39 Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Order. The parties' proposed order (Doc. 39-1) is adopted in part and modified in part. The Court has modified section 11, which governs the filing of confidential material under seal, to refer to the Court's procedures in Appendix H to the Local rules for seeking leave to file documents under seal. The modified protective order will be entered separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/26/2021. (jpk) |
|
40 | 40
![]() CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/26/2021. (jpk) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
![]() Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Order by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, January 31, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First RFPs to Corporate Defendants by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
37 | 37
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Response to Defs' First ROGS to Plaintiff (previously served 1.30.21) by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
36 | 36
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Responses to Defendants RFPs to Plaintiff (previously served 1.26.21) by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
![]() TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (ddm) (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc..(Olson, Carey) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (aaq) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S SCHEDULING ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING MANAGEMENT OF CIVIL CASES - On November 11, 2020, the parties filed their amended joint preliminary report and discovery plan. [Doc.30 .] The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as stated in the joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Discovery shall close on April 2, 2021. The parties shall file any motions for summary judgment no later than May 2, 2021, unless otherwise permitted by order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/24/2020. (tcc) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Order GRANTING29 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-CV-03215-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/12/2020. (bdb) |
|
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Amended JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
29 | 29
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
![]() First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re26 Order,, Set Submission Deadline, Plaintiff Portion of JPR to Defendants by Demond Antonio Puckett.(Price, Anitra) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER: The parties' Joint Report and Discovery Plan was due on October 30, 2020; however, the parties have not filed their report. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file their Joint Report and Discovery Plan no later than November 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/3/2020. (jed) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc., Chesley Brown International, Inc., Felita Davis, Jeff Greene, Ricky Muse (sp.). (Olson, Carey) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Defendants Jeff Greene, Felita Davis and Rick Muse ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint for Damages by Felita Davis, Jeff Greene, Ricky Muse (sp.).(Olson, Carey) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Defendants Chesley Brown Companies, Inc. and Chesley Brown International, Inc.s ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint for Damages by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc..(Olson, Carey) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Felita Davis. Discovery ends on 2/1/2021.(tmf) |
|
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Elizabeth Olson on behalf of Chesley Brown Companies, Inc. (Olson, Carey) Modified on 9/4/2020 to edit text (tmf) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Elizabeth Olson on behalf of Chesley Brown Companies, Inc. (Olson, Carey) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/01 9:41 PM
ORDER by docket entry only, GRANTING16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Defendants have through and including September 30, 2020, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/1/2020. (mnd) |
|
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint re:1 Complaint, by Chesley Brown Companies, Inc..(McLaughlin, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Return of Service Executed by Demond Antonio Puckett. Ricky Muse (sp.) served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Price, Anitra) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Return of Service Executed by Demond Antonio Puckett. Felita Davis served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Price, Anitra) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Return of Service Executed by Demond Antonio Puckett. Jeff Greene served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Price, Anitra) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Return of Service Executed by Demond Antonio Puckett. Chesley Brown International, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/5/2020. (Price, Anitra) Modified on 9/8/2020 to correct service date (bdb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Return of Service Executed by Demond Antonio Puckett. Chesley Brown Companies, Inc. served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Price, Anitra) Modified to accurately reflect correct service date on 9/8/2020 (bdb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Return of Service Unexecuted by Demond Antonio Puckett as to Felita Davis. (Price, Anitra) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Return of Service Unexecuted by Demond Antonio Puckett as to Ricky Muse (sp.). (Price, Anitra) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Felita Davis. (adg) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeff Greene. (adg) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Ricky Muse (sp.). (adg) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Chesley Brown International, Inc.. (adg) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Electronic Summons Issued as to Chesley Brown Companies, Inc.. (adg) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Demond Antonio Puckett(Price, Anitra) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Demond Antonio Puckett. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9979803)(eop) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |