TikTok Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Commerce et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-07672 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 20, 2021 2:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Wilbur L Ross, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Commerce
|
|
Plaintiff
Bytedance Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TikTok Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | TikTok sues Trump admin., says ban is unconstitutional and political (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/26/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)20 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Sunday, September 20, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Hall, John) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Beth Brinkman RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak) |
|
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Benjamin Cain RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anders Linderot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. designating Mitchell A. Kamen as local counsel14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan C. Keenan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. and designating Mitchell A. Kamen as local counsel13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander A. Berengaut to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. and designating Mitchell A. Kamen as local counsel12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anders Linderot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27864201) filed by Plaintiff Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Kamin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan C. Keenan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27864000) filed by Plaintiff Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Kamin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander A. Berengaut to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27863700) filed by Plaintiff Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Kamin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07672 ODW(MAAx). (rn) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin G. Cain. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Beth S. Brinkmann. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) |
|
8 | 8
![]() 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Wilbur L Ross, Jr., Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Commerce. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mitchell A Kamin counsel for Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. Adding Mitchell A. Kamin as counsel of record for TIKTOK INC. and BYTEDANCE LTD. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs TIKTOK INC. and BYTEDANCE LTD.. (Attorney Mitchell A Kamin added to party Bytedance Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Mitchell A Kamin added to party TikTok Inc.(pty:pla))(Kamin, Mitchell) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc..(Hall, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd.. (Hall, John) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Hall, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27752836 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Bytedance Ltd., TikTok Inc.. (Attorney John Edward Hall added to party Bytedance Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney John Edward Hall added to party TikTok Inc.(pty:pla))(Hall, John) |