Ruffin v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81388 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 20, 2021 5:36 AM EST |
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Merck-Medco RX Services
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi SA
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe R. Ruffin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 16, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Mon 09/19 12:33 PM
ORDER Deconsolidated Cases. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Thu 06/30 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Joe R. Ruffin (Charlip, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 09/15 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David H. Charlip on behalf of Joe R. Ruffin (Charlip, David) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/31 12:12 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Wed 08/26 9:20 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Palm Beach (Office - West Palm Beach) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 08/25 11:31 AM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:20-cv-81388-RLR with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 08/25 11:23 AM
Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 08/25 8:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) |
|
1 | 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13402412, filed by Joe R. Ruffin.(Charlip, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |