Faucheaux v. Pfizer et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81411 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:20-cv-02243 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 22, 2021 6:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Faucheaux, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Fri 09/16 3:29 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 06/28 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Thomas Faucheaux, III (Pendley, Madeline) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/23 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Madeline Pendley on behalf of Thomas Faucheaux, III. Attorney Madeline Pendley added to party Thomas Faucheaux, III(pty:pla). (Pendley, Madeline) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 12/09 5:13 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Thomas Faucheaux, III.(Kehoe, Patrick) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
MDL Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/31 12:12 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 08/26 3:05 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:20-cv-02243 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81411-RLR on 8/26/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 08/26 2:59 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 08/26 2:56 PM
Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02243. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
6 | 6
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 08/26 10:06 AM
Order of MDL Transfer to District of Florida Southern. MDL case number is 2924. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(lt) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
5 | 5
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 08/26 9:51 AM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2924. (lt) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (lt) | |
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corp., Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sheppard, James) | |
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Parish of Jefferson, case number 809028, Div. P (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8444585) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - All State Court Pleadings; Attorney James Robert Sheppard, III added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sheppard, James) Modified on 8/13/2020 (lt). (Entered: 08/12/2020 |