Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03070
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas D. Robertson
Three Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street Suite 1301
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Thomas D. Robertson
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/17 8:39 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3070. (rdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
43 43 order Stipulation Tue 10/17 4:51 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Released Claims Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 42 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
42 42 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/17 4:15 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Stipulation for Dismissal of Released Claims with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. Case Management Action due after 10/31/2023. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Tue 10/17 4:54 PM
Hearing Dropped. The starus conference on 12/14/23 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. Case dismissed on 10/17/23. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued
Monday, May 22, 2023
41 41 order Stipulation Mon 05/22 1:20 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Consummation of Settlement Agreement Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 40 Stipulation To Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Consummation Of Settlement Agreement Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
40 40 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 05/22 12:00 PM
Stipulation Stipulation To Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Consummation Of Settlement Agreement with Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman, Hearing Continued
order Judge Docket Order Mon 05/22 1:26 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) On May 22, 2023, the court entered an order (Dkt. 41) approving a stipulation (Dkt. 40) that provides for a stay of this proceeding for all purposes pending consummation of a settlement that resolves all remaining claims. In light of this, the court orders as follows: (1) The court will convene a status conference on December 14, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (2) The December 14 status conference will convene via Zoom. The court encourages all interested parties to consult the court's website for information about the status of court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic. The court's website also offers information explaining how to arrange an appearance at a video hearing. If you have questions about court operations or how to participate in a video hearing, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the court's website. (3) If the parties are unable to file a stipulation of dismissal by December 11, 2023, they shall file a statement explaining the status of their settlement and how they intend to bring this proceeding to a conclusion. This statement shall not exceed 5 pages, absent prior leave of court. Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 05/22 1:29 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (Pre-Hearing conference on 6/15/2023 vacated.) (ds)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
39 39 order Stipulation Tue 03/07 3:13 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Released Claims Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation for Dismissal of Released Claims filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, March 03, 2023
38 38 stip Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/03 11:09 AM
Stipulation, for Dismissal of Released Claims with Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Monday, November 21, 2022
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 11/21 9:30 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/15/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (Hearing continued per order filed on 11/19/22.) (ds)
Related: [-] 37 Order on Stipulation
Saturday, November 19, 2022
37 37 order Stipulation Mon 11/21 9:28 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To (1) Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference; and (2) Further Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Related [+]. (Hearing continued to 6/15/23 at 2:00 p.m.) (ds)
Related: [-] 36 Stipulation filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson
Friday, November 18, 2022
36 36 stip Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/18 5:38 PM
Stipulation, To (1) Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference; And (2) Further Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson Related [+]. (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-] 34 Order on Stipulation
Friday, November 11, 2022
35 35 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Fri 11/11 5:32 PM
Notice of Change of Address . (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
34 34 order Stipulation Tue 07/12 4:36 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to (1) Continue Scheduling Conference and Final Pre-Trial Conference; and (2) Further Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 33 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson, Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief
33 33 stip Continue Hearing Tue 07/12 3:25 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing , Stipulation, TO (1) CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; AND (2) FURTHER EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 3/16/2023 at 02:00 PM for ,. (Ghanaat, Bina)
Related: [-] Hearing Set (Adv)
Thursday, June 02, 2022
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/02 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Notice
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
31 31 notice Notice Tue 05/31 5:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 30 Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Appearance (Related Doc29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman) (ds)
30 30 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 4:58 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Appearance Related [+] (ds)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
29 29 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 12:09 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
28 28 order Stipulation Tue 02/01 8:32 AM
Order Approving Amended Stipulation (1) to Continue February 10, 2022 Scheduling Conference; (2) to Set a Final Pre-Trial Conference for December 15, 2022; and (3) to Further Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 27 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson
Monday, January 31, 2022
27 27 stip Continue Hearing Mon 01/31 8:43 PM
Amended Stipulation to Continue Hearing re Scheduling Conference, to Set a Final Pre-Trial Conference for December 15, 2022, and to Further Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 02:00 PM for ,. (Ghanaat, Bina)
Related: [-] Hearing Set (Adv),25 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson,26 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
26 26 stip Extend Time Wed 01/26 11:21 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time STIPULATION (1) TO VACATE FEBRUARY 10, 2022 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; AND (2) FURTHER EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson. (Ghanaat, Bina)
Related: [-]
25 25 stip Extend Time Wed 01/26 11:12 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time STIPULATION (1) TO VACATE FEBRUARY 10, 2022 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; AND (2) FURTHER EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson. (Ghanaat, Bina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
order Judge Docket Order Fri 01/21 7:46 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is set to come before the court for a continued scheduling conference on February 10, 2022. No later than February 3, 2022, the parties shall file a joint scheduling conference statement advising of the status of their efforts to settle this dispute and, if those efforts have not succeeded, a proposed schedule for moving the action forward. Failure to timely comply with this order might result in the imposition of monetary or other sanctions on the noncompliant party or parties and/or their counsel. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, January 10, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Mon 01/10 5:57 PM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
23 23 order Appointing Resolution Advocate Mon 08/09 4:35 PM
Order Granting Stipulation (1) For Withdrawal Of Bankruptcy Reference; (2) To Stay Proceeding; And (3) For Referral To Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (BDRP) Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson
22 22 stip Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/09 2:50 PM
Stipulation, (1) For Withdrawal Of Bankruptcy Reference; (2) To Stay Proceeding And Vacate Existing Pre-Trial Deadlines; And (3) For Referral To Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (BDRP) Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson. (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Adv) Mon 08/09 4:40 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 2/10/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (bg)
Related: [-] 23 Order Appointing Resolution Advocate, Order on Stipulation
court Hearing Dropped Mon 08/09 4:43 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] 5/12/22 pretrial off calendar per order on 8/9/12. (bg)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 06, 2021
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/06 4:52 PM
First Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Thomas D. Robertson. (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/03 10:26 AM
Answer to Complaint First Amended Filed by Thomas D. Robertson. (Glezakos, Tina)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/19 1:46 PM
Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Complaint
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/19 1:44 PM
Amended Complaint (First) by Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of James Gansman against Thomas D. Robertson. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, July 16, 2021
17 17 order Stipulation Fri 07/16 12:47 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Re: Filing And Responding To Liquidating Trustee's First Amended Complaint And To Continue All Pre-Trial And Discovery Dates By 120 Days Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/16 11:40 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
15 15 stip Continue Hearing Fri 07/16 11:34 AM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing on (I) All Pretrial and Discovery Dates and (II) Filing and Responding to Liquidating Trustee's First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. 5/9/2022 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for13 , (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 07/16 12:48 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 7/16/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Monday, January 25, 2021
14 14 audio audio Mon 01/25 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/21/2021 2:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 20507 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:25:25 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/21 4:18 PM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (bg)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adv) Thu 01/21 2:29 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. Greg Rougeau appeared for the Defendant. The court will enter a scheduling order reflecting the deadlines discussed on the record. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, January 14, 2021
12 12 misc Joinder Thu 01/14 6:11 PM
Joinder Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Thomas D. Robertson (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-] 9 Status Conference Statement
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/14 3:39 PM
Amended Certificate of Service of Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk removed linkage to document #10. Modified on 1/15/2021 (myt)
Related: [-] 9 Status Conference Statement
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/14 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service of Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Status Conference Statement
9 9 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 01/14 3:09 PM
Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Tue 10/20 10:21 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on October 22, 2020 for a telephonic scheduling conference. Defendant timely filed his Answer on October 19, 2020 (Dkt. 8), pursuant to the parties' stipulation of September 24, 2020 (Dkt. 6), which the court approved on October 13, 2020. Both parties have consented to entry of a final judgment by the bankruptcy court. In order to give the parties an opportunity to discuss settlement, the court orders as follows: (1) the telephonic scheduling conference is hereby continued to January 21, 2021 at 2:00 p.m.; (2) the deadlines set forth in FRBP 7026/FRCP 26(a)(1) (initial disclosures), 26(f)(1) (discovery conference), and 26(f)(2) (discovery plan) shall be calculated from January 21, 2021; and (3) the parties shall meet and confer by telephone or by video within the next 45 days to discuss settlement. Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 10/20 10:24 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/20/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, October 19, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/19 5:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Thomas D. Robertson. (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Tue 10/13 11:38 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) Good cause appearing therefor, the stipulation (Dkt. 6) is hereby APPROVED: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than October 19, 2020. Related [+]. (Jamieson, Joshua)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 10/13 11:58 AM
Thomas D. Robertson Answer Deadline Reset for 10/19/2020. (bg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 2:06 PM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph). Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document 1. Modified on 9/24/2020 (lb)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
6 6 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 09/24 2:03 PM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,5 Summons Service Executed
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/02 8:41 AM
Summons Service Executed on Thomas D. Robertson 9/1/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 29, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/29 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, August 27, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Thu 08/27 10:26 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lm)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 08/27 10:21 AM
Summons Issued on Thomas D. Robertson Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/26 4:07 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03070 . 12 Related [+], 13, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Thomas D. Robertson. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet