Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:May 27, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph P. Smick, an individual
1 Battery Park Plz. FL 32
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Joseph P. Smick
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedqwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Thursday, May 27, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/27 9:59 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3071. (lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/12 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/12 9:16 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 05/26/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Wed 05/12 10:37 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The 7/8/21 scheduling conference is off calendar per notice of voluntary dismissal on 5/12/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, March 29, 2021
16 16 order Stipulation Mon 03/29 2:53 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation To Extend Time To File Response To Complaint And To Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/29 9:42 AM
Certificate of Service of Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
14 14 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 03/29 9:39 AM
Stipulation (Fourth) to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 03/29 2:54 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 3/29/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, February 01, 2021
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 02/01 8:34 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continiued per order on 1/29/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Friday, January 29, 2021
13 13 order Stipulation Mon 02/01 8:33 AM
Order Approving Third Stipulation To Extend Time To File Response To Complaint And To Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/29 9:25 AM
Certificate of Service of Third Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
11 11 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Fri 01/29 9:22 AM
Stipulation (Third) to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
10 10 order Stipulation Wed 11/25 1:25 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Extend Time To File Response To Complaint And To Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/25 10:54 AM
Certificate of Service re Second Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 11/25 10:51 AM
Stipulation (Second) To Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 11/25 1:26 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 11/25/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
7 7 order Stipulation Wed 09/30 12:23 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Extend Time In Which Defendants May Respond To The Complaint And To Continue The Initial StatusConference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/30 9:59 AM
Certificate of Service re Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
5 5 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 09/30 9:26 AM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 09/30 12:24 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 9/30/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/02 8:46 AM
Summons Service Executed on Joseph P. Smick 9/1/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Thu 08/27 9:54 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 08/27 9:53 AM
Summons Issued on Joseph P. Smick Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (aw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/26 4:15 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03071 . 12 Related [+], 13, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Joseph P. Smick. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet