Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03072
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:Dec 23, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
John F. Stephens
515 S. Flower Street Suite 1800
Los Angeles, CA 90071
Represented By
John F. Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, December 23, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/23 3:28 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3072. (pw)
Related: [-]
misc Document Fri 12/23 10:30 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 12/10/2022 returned as undeliverable. Returned Mail: The following order sent to John F. Stephens 361 North Monterey Road Palm Springs, CA 92262-6566 on 12/10/2022 was returned as undeliverable: Order to Dismiss Case (ADI Administrator court)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 10, 2022
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 12/10 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 12/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order to Dismiss Case
Thursday, December 08, 2022
40 40 order Dismiss Case Thu 12/08 11:34 AM
Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 12/22/2022. (ds)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
39 39 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/08 9:32 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
38 38 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/08 9:25 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. Case Management Action due after 12/22/2022. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 09/28 2:28 PM
Hearing Continued. The scheduling conference on 10/20/22 is continued to 2/2/23 at 2:00 p.m. pursuant to the court's 9/26/22 Docket Text Order. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Monday, September 26, 2022
order Judge Docket Order Mon 09/26 9:21 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on October 20, 2022 for a continued scheduling conference. On September 2, 2022, Plaintiff James Gansman filed a notice (Dkt. 36) indicating that Defendant John F. Stephens has filed a petition for relief under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Central District of California (Case No. 22-12796 , which automatically stays this proceeding. Based on the pendency of Mr. Stephens' bankruptcy case, the court orders as follows: (1) The scheduling conference is hereby continued to February 2, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (2) The February 2, 2023 continued scheduling conference will convene via Zoom. The court encourages all interested parties to consult the court's website for information about court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic. The court's website also offers information explaining how to arrange an appearance at a video hearing. If you have questions about court operations or how to participate in a video hearing, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the court's website. (3) No later than January 26, 2023, Mr. Gansman shall file a statement advising of the status of Mr. Stephens' bankruptcy and its impact on this proceeding. Mr. Gansman's statement shall not exceed 5 pages, absent prior leave of court. (4) The court welcomes a similar statement from Mr. Stephens, so long as it is filed no later than January 26, 2023 and does not exceed 5 pages. Related [+]. (Fuchs, Cheyanna)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order,36 Notice filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Dropped Mon 09/26 9:58 AM
Hearing Dropped. The scheduling conference on 10/20/22 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated pursuant to the court's 9/26/22 Docket Text Order. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Friday, September 02, 2022
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/02 11:56 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 36 Notice
36 36 notice Notice Fri 09/02 11:45 AM
Notice Regarding Notice of Defendant's Bankruptcy Petition Filing and Stay of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, June 02, 2022
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Thu 06/02 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
34 34 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 5:00 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Appearance Related [+] (ds)
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman.
33 33 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/31 12:11 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
32 32 order Stipulation Mon 04/04 5:20 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Extend the Discovery Dates and Deadlines Related [+]. (ds)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/04 4:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued,30 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
30 30 stip Continue Hearing Mon 04/04 3:48 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Third Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Extend the Discovery Dates and Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 17 ,. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order, Hearing Continued
Monday, January 10, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address (Multi) Mon 01/10 5:57 PM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
28 28 order Stipulation Mon 12/20 3:35 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Modify The Scheduling Order And To Extend The Discovery Dates And Deadlines Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/20 11:28 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
26 26 stip Continue Hearing Mon 12/20 10:32 AM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Second Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order and Extend the Discovery Dates and Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 12/20 3:36 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 12/20/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
25 25 order Stipulation Tue 09/21 11:56 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Modify The Scheduling Order And To Extend The Discovery Dates And Deadlines Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 09/21 11:56 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 9/21/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Monday, September 20, 2021
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/20 5:47 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief
23 23 stip Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/20 5:32 PM
Stipulation, Modify the Scheduling Order and to Extend the Discovery Dates and Deadines Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Coy, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, March 25, 2021
misc Document Thu 03/25 10:30 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 01/23/2021 returned as undeliverable. Returned Mail: The following order sent to John F. Stephens 515 S. Flower Street Suite 1800 Los Angeles, CA 90071-2231 on 01/23/2021 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADI Administrator court)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
22 22 misc Witness List Thu 02/18 8:38 AM
Defendant John Francis Stephens' Initial Disclosures. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/28 1:56 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (myt)
Related: [-] 20 Declaration
20 20 misc Declaration Thu 01/28 1:55 PM
Declaration of John Francis Stephens Regarding Federal Bankruptcy Rule 7012(B) & Local Rule 7012-1 Requirements Related [+]. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (myt)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Monday, January 25, 2021
19 19 audio audio Mon 01/25 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/21/2021 2:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 20507 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:25:25 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 01/23 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Thursday, January 21, 2021
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/21 4:19 PM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (bg)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adv) Thu 01/21 2:30 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. John Stephens appeared for the pro se. The court will enter a scheduling order reflecting the deadlines discussed on the record. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, January 14, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/15 9:53 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (myt)
Related: [-] 15 Status Conference Statement
15 15 misc Status Conference Statement Fri 01/15 9:52 AM
Defendant John Francis Stephens' Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (myt)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/14 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Status Conference Statement
13 13 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 01/14 3:13 PM
Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/05 9:48 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant John F. Stephens (lj)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/05 9:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by John F. Stephens . (lj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/01 2:59 PM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
9 9 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Tue 12/01 2:57 PM
Stipulation (Second) to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,5 Summons Service Executed
Friday, October 23, 2020
8 8 order Set Hearing Fri 10/23 12:28 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (Status Conference continued to 1/21/21 at 2:00 p.m.) (ds)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, October 22, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/22 12:24 PM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
6 6 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 10/22 12:16 PM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Monday, October 19, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 10/19 6:58 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This adversary proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on October 22, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the Certificate of Service (Dkt. 5) pertaining to the Summons (Dkt. 3) issued August 27, 2020 and finds that Plaintiff has served Defendant with process in compliance with FRBP 7004(b)(1). Pursuant to FRBP 7012(a), Defendant's initial responsive pleading was due on or before September 28, 2020; none has been filed. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) within 14 calendar days following entry of this docket text order, Plaintiff shall request entry of default pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(a); (2) within 30 calendar days following entry of default, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(b)(2); and (3) the scheduling conference is hereby continued to January 21, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued,5 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 10/19 8:03 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/19/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/02 8:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on John F. Stephens 9/1/2020 . (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 29, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/29 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Thursday, August 27, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/27 10:29 AM
Summons Issued on John F. Stephens Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/22/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 order Discovery Thu 08/27 10:23 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/26 4:48 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03072 . 12 Related [+], 13, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against John F. Stephens. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet