New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-07097
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 4:59 AM EST
Defendant
Lilly Lashes, LLC
Plaintiff
Jenisa Angeles
Represented By
David Paul Force
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 07, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/07 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Lilly Lashes, LLC. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/07 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Rozenberg on behalf of Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/07 9:59 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than October 20, 2022 why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/6/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/02 10:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lilly Lashes, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 09/02 10:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/02 10:45 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/02 10:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/01 7:41 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lilly Lashes, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Force, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/01 7:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/01 7:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Lilly Lashes, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21422698)Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Force, David)
Related: [-]