Florida Southern District Court
Judge:John J O'Sullivan
Case #: 1:20-cv-23648
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 19, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 28, 2021 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
Aroldo Guadamuz
Represented By
Ena Teresa Diaz
Ena T. Diaz, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Guadamuz Concrete Finishi, Inc.
Represented By
Ena Teresa Diaz
Ena T. Diaz, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Daniel T Feld
ATD Mediation 10125 Emerson Street
Pompano, FL 33076
Plaintiff
Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales
Represented By
Jamie H. Zidell
contact info
David Mark Nudel
J.H. Zidell P.A.
contact info
Natalie Ann Staroschak
J.H. Zidell, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/19 1:25 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
25 25 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 11/13 1:01 PM
ORDER approving settlement and dismissing case with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until January 13, 2021 to enforce the terms of the settlement. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Fairness Hearing Fri 11/13 11:51 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Telephonic Fairness Hearing held on 11/13/2020. Total time in court: 13 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Ena Teresa Diaz, Jamie H. Zidell. Related [+] (cg1)
Related: [-] cording: AT&T CONFERENCE JJO_01_11.13.2020.10:00 am
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 11/13 1:38 PM
Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated PER DE25 . (lbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 11/10 11:56 AM
Hearing(s) for Judge Ungaro terminated per DE20 . (pcs)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
23 23 order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Sun 11/08 12:15 PM
PAPERLESS Order re-setting fairness hearing ( Fairness Hearing re-set for 11/13/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/8/2020. (mkr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 11/06 10:46 AM
Order setting fairness hearing and cancelling settlement conference ( Fairness Hearing set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 11/06 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales (Zidell, Jamie)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 11/06 10:13 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Trial. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned as presider judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/06 8:32 AM
Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales (Zidell, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
18 18 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 11/02 3:38 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to17 Statement of Claim filed by Plaintiff by Aroldo Guadamuz, Guadamuz Concrete Finishi, Inc.. (Diaz, Ena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
17 17 misc Statement Wed 10/14 3:13 PM
Statement of: of Claim by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales re5 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Staroschak, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/09 9:05 AM
NOTICE by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales of Disassociation of Counsel (Nudel, David)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Attorneys Fri 10/09 3:32 PM
Attorney David Mark Nudel representing Matus Morales, Ruddy Ismael (Plaintiff) terminated per DE16 . (lbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/29 11:13 AM
Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint and Defenses by Aroldo Guadamuz, Guadamuz Concrete Finishi, Inc.. (Diaz, Ena)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
14 14 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 09/25 8:00 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Daniel T. Feld Mediation Hearing set for 2/9/2021 10:30 AM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
13 13 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 09/21 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Daniel T Feld as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/09/2021 @ 10:30 a.m.. (Niad Hannah, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 09/15 1:12 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales.(Zidell, Jamie)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 09/15 11:26 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to File and Serve First Amended Complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge . Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Mon 09/14 12:55 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File and Serve First Amended Complaint by Ruddy Ismael Matus Morales.(Zidell, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 09/09 2:03 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/09 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2020. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021. Motions due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/2/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 6/2/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
7 7 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 09/08 4:43 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal and Defenses by Aroldo Guadamuz, Guadamuz Concrete Finishi, Inc.. (Diaz, Ena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/02 3:01 PM
ORDER setting settlement conference through Zoom (Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order of Requirements Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/02 2:10 PM
ORDER AND REFERRAL IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (Statement of Claim due by 10/16/2020.), referring case to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 09/02 2:07 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/23/2020) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 09/02 12:17 PM
STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 09/01 3:23 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 09/01 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint Under 29 US 201-216 Overtime Wage Violations, Unpaid Wages, and Federal Minimum Wage Violations) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13448235, filed by Aroldo Guadamuz, Guadamuz Concrete Finishi, Inc..(Diaz, Ena)No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 9/1/2020 (pcs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Returns of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Notice of Removal (State Court)