New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:20-cv-01185
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:270 Miller Act
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 07, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 28, 2021 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.
28 Liberty Street 4th Floor
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Theodore M. Baum
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney &carpenter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron A. Mitchell
Lawall & Mitchell, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 07, 2021
14 14 order Text Order Thu 01/07 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER re: Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., Docket Item13 , IS HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 01/07/2021.(SAV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/06 12:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
12 12 order Text Order Fri 12/18 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER re11 Stipulation of Time to Answer Complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 01/06/2021. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/18/2020. (SAV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 12/17 11:41 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, of Time to Answer by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
10 10 order Text Order Tue 11/24 11:20 AM
TEXT ORDER re9 Stipulation of Time to Answer Complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 12/18/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/24/2020. (SAV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 11/23 11:44 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, of Time to Answer by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
8 8 order Text Order ~Util - Update Answer Due Date Tue 11/03 1:25 PM
TEXT ORDER re6 Stipulation of Time to Answer Complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The defendant's time to answer or otherwise make motions with respect to the complaint is extended to 11/30/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/2/2020. (CMD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/03 9:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 10/30 11:19 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, of Time to Answer by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/30 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M. Baum on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. (Baum, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
utility Remark Wed 09/16 11:41 AM
ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/15 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 service Original Summons Filed Mon 09/14 11:13 PM
Original Summons Filed. (Mitchell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
2 2 misc Continuation of Exhibits Wed 09/02 1:41 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.. (Mitchell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Wed 09/02 11:07 AM
E-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (JD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/02 2:46 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Wed 09/02 2:47 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(JD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 09/02 2:48 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JD)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 09/02 2:49 PM
Remark: Original summons not submitted. (JD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/01 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3960054, filed by Total Environmental Concepts, Inc..(Mitchell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Bonds,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Subcontract,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Application for Payment