Martel et al v. Condos
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-00131 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 03, 2021 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant
James Condos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raoul Beaulieu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Beausoleil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Frenier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Martel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Smith
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal Lawsuit Challenges Constitutionality Of Vermont's Vote-By-Mail Plan For 2020 (vpr.org) |
Submitted Fri 09/11/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() JUDGMENT - The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/16/2020. (esb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER denying2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting10 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/16/2020. (esb) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Ruling on Motions
Tue 09/15 4:45 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2020 re:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and REQUEST for Expedited Hearing. D. Bucknam, Esq., H. Dhillon, Esq., D. Warrington, Esq., M. Meuser, Esq. present for plaintiffs. D. Groff, AAG, P. Back, AAG present for defendant. All counsel present by video/telephone conference. Court makes inquiries and counsel make statements. ORDERED:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is taken under advisement and REQUEST for Expedited Hearing is granted. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/15 8:42 AM
ORDER granting7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Warrington; granting8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Meuser; granting9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harmeet K. Dhillon. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/14/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() DECLARATION of Scott E. Gessler re:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REQUEST for Expedited Hearing by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (Bucknam, Deborah) |
|
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REQUEST for Expedited Hearing filed by James Condos.(Groff, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Condos.(Back, Philip) . Text clarified on 9/14/2020 (jlh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harmeet K. Dhillon filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith.(law) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark P. Meuser filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith.(law) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Warrington filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith.(law) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Hearing re:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing by videoconference set for 9/15/2020 at 2:30 PM in Rutland Courtroom before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Groff, Esq on behalf of James Condos.(Groff, David) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip A. Back, Esq on behalf of James Condos.(Back, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: James Condos waiver sent on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020.(Bucknam, Deborah) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Expedited Hearing re1 Complaint, filed by Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Robert Frenier, Tracey Martel, Brian Smith. (esb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against James Condos filed by Tracey Martel, Robert Frenier, Raoul Beaulieu, Mary Beausoleil, Brian Smith. Summons issued. (esb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |