Matalavage v. Niagara County et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Skretny |
Referred: | Leslie G Foschio |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01254 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 08, 2021 5:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Michael Filicetti
Niagara County Sheriff 5526 Niagara Street Extension PO Box 496
Lockport, NY 14095 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Payne
Niagara County Jail 5526 Niagara Street Extension PO Box 496
Lockport, NY 14095 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Prygon
Niagara County Jail 5526 Niagara Street Extension PO Box 496
Lockport, NY 14095 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
County of Niagara, New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheriff of the County of Niagara
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Mary Helenbrook
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Matalavage
1968 Creekside Drive
Burt, NY 14028 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
97 | 97
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/28 5:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re85 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Alexandra Matalavage.(Richmond, Anna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 80 - ESRRs, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 78 - Diagram, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 79-Diagram, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
96 | 96
respm
Reply/Response
Fri 06/28 4:08 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re88 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by County of Niagara, New York, Michael Filicetti, Kevin Payne, Michael Prygon, Sheriff of the County of Niagara. (Hickey, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
95 | 95
order
Text Order
Mon 06/24 11:36 AM
TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants'94 request to extend the page limit for their reply memorandum of law is GRANTED. Defendants' reply memorandum of law must not exceed 20 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 6/24/2024. (JCM) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
94 | 94
respm
Reply/Response
Fri 06/21 3:53 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re93 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Defendants Request Permission to Exceed the 10-page limit for the Memorandum of Law filed by County of Niagara, New York, Michael Filicetti, Kevin Payne, Sheriff of the County of Niagara. (McGraw, Kathleen) |