Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Referred: Michelle H Burns
Case #: 2:20-cv-01759
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Terminated:May 14, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, November 04, 2022
30 30 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 11/04 4:24 PM
Filing fee: $1.05, receipt number 200002884. PAID IN FULL. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
29 29 order Clerks Judgment Fri 05/14 2:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed May 14, 2021, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the second amended complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (DXD)
Related: [-]
28 28 6 pgs order Order Fri 05/14 2:17 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc.27 ) and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk shall make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), has considered whether an appeal of this decision would be taken in good faith and finds Plaintiff may appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/14/21. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/11 4:05 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Sivaja, M Smith, D Wischhusen filed by Abdiaziz Abdi. (7 Pages) (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
26 26 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Thu 02/04 8:39 AM
ORDER - The First Amended Complaint (Doc.22 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim wit 30 days leave to file a second amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc.24 ) and a Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc.25 ) are denied. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/3/21. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Form
Monday, January 04, 2021
25 25 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 01/07 11:51 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Abdiaziz Abdi (4 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
24 24 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 12/04 12:16 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Abdiaziz Abdi (5 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
23 23 misc Request Wed 11/04 9:44 AM
REQUEST for Relief by Plaintiff Abdiaziz Abdi (8 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/04 9:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against M Smith, Unknown Sivaja, D Wischhusen filed by Abdiaziz Abdi (6 pages).(DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
21 21 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Tue 10/27 9:24 AM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Abdiaziz Abdi. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/26/20. (DXD)
Related: [-]
20 20 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/27 9:23 AM
ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $10.15. Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel (Doc14 ), Motion for Cleaning Supplies (Doc.18 ), and Motion for Check-Up (Doc.19 ) are denied. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim with 30 days leave to file and amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/26/20. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Form
Friday, October 16, 2020
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/20 12:42 PM
MOTION for Bloos Pressure Check Up by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/20 12:41 PM
MOTION for Cleaning Supplies by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/20 12:40 PM
NOTICE to the Court re: Interrogatories by Abdiaziz Abdi (2 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/20 12:39 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/20 12:34 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 10/14 11:53 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Abdiaziz Abdi. (SLQ) (4 pages)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/08 12:30 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (7 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
12 12 misc Request Thu 09/24 5:05 PM
REQUEST re:10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Abdiaziz Abdi (5 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 09/24 5:04 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Abdiaziz Abdi (3 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/24 5:03 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Abdiaziz Abdi (2 pages). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 09/17 8:02 AM
ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/16/20. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/18 3:33 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/18 3:30 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/18 3:24 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/18 3:20 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/18 3:19 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Abdiaziz Abdi (1 page). (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
3 3 misc Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing Wed 09/09 3:50 PM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SST)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Wed 09/09 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SST)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/09 3:49 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Abdiaziz Abdi. (SST) (35 pages)
Related: [-]