Mays et al v. Fields et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Bernard A Friedman |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-12504 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 10, 2021 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Santino Guerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eva Worthing
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeri Winfrey-Carter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Herbert Winfrey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheldon Neely
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Duvarl Murdock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Metcalf
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allan Griggs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Monica Galloway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kate Fields
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maurice Davis
15232039 Federal Prison Camp Maxwell Maxwell Air Force Base
Montgomery, AL 36112 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Flint
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Tarlton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Billings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liberty Bell
|
Represented By
|
1. | Flint city councilman files federal lawsuit against mayor, city attorney and others (abc17news.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/15/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() FINAL statement by City of Flint that garnishment has been satisfied. (DPer) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE by All Defendants of Satisfaction of Judgment (Kim, William) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2021. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Suzanne Jacques) (Number of Pages: 13) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/31/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (JPur) |
|
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF MAYS'27 OBJECTIONS TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() MEMORANDUM re27 Objection to Garnishment City of Flint's Response by City of Flint (Kim, William) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() GARNISHEE disclosure by City of Flint as to Eric Mays. (no postmark - receive date stamp 8/5/2021) (TTho) |
|
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. Judgment in the amount of $34,975. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting Defendants'19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 05/12 3:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2021 re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Angela Wheeler, Herbert Winfrey, Duvarl Murdock, William Metcalf, Monica Galloway, Maurice Davis, Eva Worthing, Sheldon Neely, Jeri Winfrey-Carter, Allan Griggs, City of Flint, Kate Fields, Santino Guerra Disposition: Motion granted. Court will issue order. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur) |
||
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on19 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1601288653?pwd=d09PMitUYUNYS3NZdThoeHVZSDg4Zz09 Passcode: 582787 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1601288653# or +16468287666,,1601288653#| (JCur) |
|
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE to19 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haney, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION for Attorney Fees by All Defendants. (Kim, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
17 | 17
![]() OPINION AND ORDER granting defendants'12 motion to dismiss as to plaintiffs' federal claims and dismissing plaintiffs' state-law claims without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() REPLY to Response re12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Kim, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Counsel will receive email instructions regarding courtesy copies. (JCur) |
|
14 | 14
![]() RESPONSE to12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haney, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Joint MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Kim, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File to File Exhibits In The Traditional Manner by All Defendants. (Kim, William) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting defendants'9 motion for leave to file a brief that exceeds the 25-page limit. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
|
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 01/29 2:53 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting defendants'11 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits In The Traditional Manner . Entered by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Kim, William) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION to Extend Response Deadline by All Defendants (Kim, William) |
|
order
Text-Only Order Extend Time to - Free
Thu 01/21 10:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting8 Stipulation to extend response deadline: . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/03 11:30 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting7 Stipulation to extend response deadline: ( Response due by 1/22/2021 ).Entered by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() STIPULATION to Extend Response Deadline by All Defendants (Kim, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin S. McWilliams on behalf of Herbert Winfrey, Jeri Winfrey-Carter, Eva Worthing. (McWilliams, Melvin) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin S. McWilliams on behalf of Maurice Davis, Kate Fields, Monica Galloway, Allan Griggs, Santino Guerra. (McWilliams, Melvin) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Young Kim on behalf of City of Flint, William Metcalf, Sheldon Neely, Angela Wheeler. (Kim, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Duvarl Murdock (Wolf, Barry) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8041735 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Haney, Steven) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 09/11 4:16 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SOso) |