Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Travis R Mcdonough
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:20-cv-00273
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2020
Case in other court:Chancery Court of McMinn County, Tennessee, 2020-cv-217
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 17, 2021 4:40 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.
Represented By
Erin Palmer Polly
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Gibeault D Creson
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Titan Implement, LLC
Represented By
Pharan A. Evans
Miller & Martin Pllc (atlanta)
contact info
Stephen E. Kabakoff
Miller & Martin Pllc (atlanta)
contact info
Donald J Aho
Miller & Martin, Pllc (chattanooga)
contact info
Defendant
Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.
Represented By
Erin Palmer Polly
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Gibeault D Creson
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Titan Implement, LLC
Represented By
Pharan A. Evans
Miller & Martin Pllc (atlanta)
contact info
Stephen E. Kabakoff
Miller & Martin Pllc (atlanta)
contact info
Donald J Aho
Miller & Martin, Pllc (chattanooga)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/08 3:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal case Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
33 33 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/01 9:15 AM
ORDER re 32 Notice (Other) filed by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. The parties have notified the Court of their intention to resolve this matter (Doc. 32). Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to submit a stipulation of dismissal, or a joint status report, signed by all parties that have appeared pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before March 28, 2022. The parties are ON NOTICE that, if no stipulation of dismissal or status report is filed on or before the date specified in this Order, the Court will dismiss this action withprejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) and Local Rule 68.1.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/1/2022. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/22 4:33 PM
NOTICE by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice Withdrawing Motion for Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice (Creson, Gibeault)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/14 6:41 PM
NOTICE by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Filing(Creson, Gibeault)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Titan Implement's Responses
30 30 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 12/14 6:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Austin Speck filed by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc..(Creson, Gibeault)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Titan Attachments Trademark,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Product Comparison Chart,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - R. French Message,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Dealer Confusion,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Customer Confusion,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Internet Forum Confusion,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Host Titan Attachment confusion,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Consultant Confusion,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Google Search Results
29 29 26 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 12/14 6:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (Creson, Gibeault)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 12/14 6:33 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (Creson, Gibeault)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
27 27 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 12/02 4:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re26 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Titan Implement, LLC. (Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Letters Rogatory Thu 12/02 4:26 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Titan Implement, LLC.(Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request MTI Canada,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Request Schulte Industries
Thursday, November 04, 2021
25 25 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/04 2:02 PM
ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Enlarge Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Given that the parties are in agreement, that the requested enlargement is only one month, and that the parties state "[t]he requested enlargement will not impact any other deadlines in this matter and will not impact the trial date," the Court finds the motion well taken and it is GRANTED. Disclosure of Expert Testimony is due on January 7, 2022, and disclosure of rebuttal expert testimony is due on February 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-4-21. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/03 6:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Enlarge Expert Disclosure Deadlines re23 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
23 23 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/05 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 6/27/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.).Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/5/2021. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
22 22 motion Continue Thu 07/29 4:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue the Trial Date and Enlarge Remaining Deadlines by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
21 21 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 07/20 10:16 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/20/2021. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
20 20 motion Protective Order Fri 07/09 5:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Titan Implement, LLC.(Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order
Friday, January 29, 2021
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/29 7:12 PM
NOTICE by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. Notice of Re-Affiliation and Change of Address (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
18 18 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 10/30 3:17 PM
ANSWER to12 Counterclaim by Titan Implement, LLC.(Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 4R Ventures, LLC Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Coulter Ventures LLC Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Kappers Fabricating, Inc. Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - RJ Thomas Mfg. Co., Inc. Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Cowboy Cauldron Co. Complaint
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/28 10:08 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . This entry is the complete Order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on October 28, 2020. (KLW)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/28 10:06 AM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . This entry is the complete Order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on October 28, 2020. (KLW) Notice sent to Attorney Kabakoff with instruction to finalize registration (AML)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Wed 10/28 8:14 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Kabakoff ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4532735.) filed by Titan Implement, LLC, 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Pharan Evans ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4532741.) filed by Titan Implement, LLC (AML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/27 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Pharan Evans ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4532741.) by Titan Implement, LLC.(Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/27 11:21 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Kabakoff ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4532735.) by Titan Implement, LLC.(Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, October 22, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/22 9:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/22/2020. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/22 3:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held without a courtroom deputy or court reporter before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 10/21/2020. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
12 12 cmp Counterclaim Fri 10/16 2:46 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Titan Implement, LLC, filed by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc..(Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2020
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 10/12 1:20 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aho, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
10 10 misc Patent and Trademark Notice Fri 09/25 4:01 PM
PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 5,941,411 . (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 09/25 3:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Titan Implement, LLC by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc..(Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/23 12:41 PM
ORDER Scheduling Conference reset for 10/21/2020 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2020. (BDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/22 11:02 AM
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/22/2020. (KTC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Mon 09/21 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc. (Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/21 8:05 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 21, 2020. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/Non-Consent Form(please flatten/print pdf to a non fillable format when filing)
4 4 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Mon 09/21 8:05 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 21, 2020. (SAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Mon 09/21 8:04 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 21, 2020. (SAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Mon 09/21 8:04 AM
Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 21, 2020. (SAC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/21 8:02 AM
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (SAC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Mon 09/21 8:03 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc.. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 09/18 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court of McMinn County, Tennessee, case number 2020-cv-217. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4487254), filed by Titan Manufacturing and Distributing, Inc..(Polly, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 53 pgs Exhibit A - Copy of McMinn Co. Chancery Court file,
Att: 2 Other Civil Cover Sheet