Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:20-cv-01261
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2020
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021

Debtor
NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC

,
Last checked: Saturday Mar 20, 2021 6:19 AM EDT
Appellant
Rubin Law Associates, P.A.
Represented By
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Michael Louis Vild
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Appellee
Office of the United States Trustee
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Robert J. Schneider, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice - U.S. Trustee Nj
contact info
Linda Richenderfer
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Appellee
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Sommer L. Ross
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Appellee
Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Sommer L. Ross
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Appellee
LNR Partners, LLC
Represented By
Sommer L. Ross
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Appellee
Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust
Represented By
Sommer L. Ross
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Appellee
Taconic Capital Advisors, LP
Represented By
Sommer L. Ross
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Appellee
Somera Road Inc.
Terminated: 01/15/2021
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Appellee
SomeraRoad Inc.
Terminated: 01/15/2021

GPO Oct 22 2020
Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/22/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(cak)
GPO Nov 05 2020
ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation; ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 12/7/2020., Appellee Brief due by 1/8/2021., Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/25/2021.) in case 1:20-cv-01260-CFC; 1:20-cv-01261-CFC; 1:20-cv-01262-CFC; 1:20-cv-01266-CFC; 1:20-cv-01267-CFC; re: (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01260-CFC; re (19) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01262-CFC; re (18) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01261-CFC; re (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01266-CFC; re (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01267-CFC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(nmf)
GPO Sep 29 2021
OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/29/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(nmf)

Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
60 60 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 01/23 1:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to57 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Rubin Law Associates, P.A. USCA Decision: affirmed.(mws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mandate Letter,
Att: 2 Opinion