New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:20-cv-07783
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2020
Terminated:Apr 05, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Mar 21, 2021 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Ted Brandt
Represented By
Greg Anthony Riolo
Jackson Lewis Llp (wplns)
contact info
Jonathan L. Sulds
Greenberg Traurig, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Chuck Hinckley
Represented By
Philip Joel Kessler
Thompson & Knight, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Devin Scott Cohen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Peter T. Shapiro
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (water St)
contact info
Defendant
Phillippe Lavertu
Represented By
Greg Anthony Riolo
Jackson Lewis Llp (wplns)
contact info
Jonathan L. Sulds
Greenberg Traurig, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC
Represented By
Greg Anthony Riolo
Jackson Lewis Llp (wplns)
contact info
Wendy J. Mellk
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Plaintiff
Logan Williams
Represented By
Michael John Willemin
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Sarah J. Arena
Wigdor LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 05, 2021
45 45 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Mon 04/05 5:57 PM
STIPULATION: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among counsel for the Parties, who are authorized to execute this Stipulation on behalf of their respective clients, that the above action is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and without costs to any party. The Clerk is directed to close this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/5/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
44 44 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 04/02 7:13 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 04/02 6:59 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/30 6:43 PM
ORDER granting41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/30/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/30 5:22 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Citizenship Information in Accordance with the Court's Order of March 23, 2021 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Greg Riolo dated March 30, 2021. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
40 40 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/23 5:58 PM
ORDER: The parties should identify the citizenship of each defendant. For defendant Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC, the parties should identify the citizenship of each of the members of the LLC, including, if any member is an LLC, the citizenship of each member of that LLC, and, if the member is a corporation, the state of incorporation and principle place of business of each such corporation. The information should be provided to the Court by March 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/23/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
39 39 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/01 4:29 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 02/01 4:21 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
37 37 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/21 7:37 PM
DECLARATION of Logan Williams in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/21 7:35 PM
DECLARATION of Michael J. Willemin in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
35 35 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/21 7:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/19 12:44 PM
ORDER granting33 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re33 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Willemin dated January 15, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/19/2021) Responses due by 1/21/2021 (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/15 1:46 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Willemin dated January 15, 2021. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/28 1:40 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re31 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 Declaration in Support of Motion,29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,26 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/28/2020) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/22 11:33 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 Declaration in Support of Motion,29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .,26 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,30 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Willemin dated December 22, 2020. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
30 30 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 12/18 12:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 12/18 12:49 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/16 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Joel Kessler on behalf of Chuck Hinckley..(Kessler, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 12/14 7:55 PM
DECLARATION of GREG RIOLO in Support re:25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A -Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Employment Agreement
26 26 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 12/14 7:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 12/14 7:40 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
24 24 27 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/14 7:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 114 pgs Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2 - Investigation Report,
Att: 2 115 pgs Exhibit A -Part 2 of 2 - Investigation Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Employment Agreement
23 23 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/14 5:35 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/14 4:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
21 21 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/11 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan L. Sulds on behalf of Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu..(Sulds, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Devin Scott Cohen on behalf of Chuck Hinckley..(Cohen, Devin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/30 4:11 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/30/2020) Ted Brandt answer due 12/14/2020; Phillippe Lavertu answer due 12/14/2020; Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC answer due 12/14/2020 (ks)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/30 12:25 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Greg Riolo dated November 30, 2020. Document filed by Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/20 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/16 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy J. Mellk on behalf of Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Mellk, Wendy)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/16 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Anthony Riolo on behalf of Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah J. Arena on behalf of Logan Williams..(Arena, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
13 13 cmp Complaint Fri 10/02 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Ted Brandt, Chuck Hinckley, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 10/01 9:23 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion to Seal. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/30/20) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
11 11 motion Seal Tue 09/29 5:17 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Willemin dated September 29, 2020. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Complaint
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 09/23 10:00 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ted Brandt..(jgo)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 09/23 10:00 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phillippe Lavertu..(jgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 09/23 9:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 09/23 9:57 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chuck Hinckley..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 09/23 9:48 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/23 9:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/23 9:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/22 11:03 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phillippe Lavertu, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/22 11:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chuck Hinckley, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/22 11:01 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ted Brandt, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/22 11:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/22 10:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/22 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Ted Brandt, Chuck Hinckley, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21776457)Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
Related: [-]