Aloisio et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81722 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2020 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:20-cv-07241 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 22, 2021 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Claire Aloisio
1 Cortlandt Manor Rd
Katonah, NY 10536 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Anthony Aloisio
1 Cortlandt Manor Rd
Katonah, NY 10536 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Administrative Order
Wed 09/30 10:29 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 09/23 3:07 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 7:20-cv-07241 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81722-RLR on 9/23/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 09/23 10:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 09/23 10:31 AM
Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-07241. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
6 | 6
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 09/23 9:37 AM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 09/22/2020) (sjo) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out-Divisional Transfer
Wed 09/23 9:41 AM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo) |
||
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Strides Pharma Inc...(dnh) | |
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Sanofi US Services Inc.; Chattem, Inc.; Glaxosmithkline, LLC; Strides Pharma Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC; CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Claire Aloisio, John Anthony Aloisio..(Saracino, Gregory) | |
3 | 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Claire Aloisio, John Anthony Aloisio..(Saracino, Gregory) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jgo). | |
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) | ||
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Saracino to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party names must be listed on the 'as to' docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) | ||
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saracino, Gregory) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Strides Pharma Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21498730)Document filed by Claire Aloisio, John Anthony Aloisio..(Saracino, Gregory) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Master Personal Injury Complaint |