Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03080
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nicholas J. Boos, and individual,
600 Montgomery Street Suite 2600
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Nicholas J. Boos
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/16 9:09 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
23 23 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/16 9:07 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 06/30/2021. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Dropped Wed 06/16 10:22 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The 8/5/21 scheduling conference is off calendar per stipulation to dismiss on 6/16/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 4:50 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3080. (aw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 05/24 8:22 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 5/21/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Friday, May 21, 2021
22 22 order Stipulation Fri 05/21 5:01 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation To Continue Scheduling Conferenc Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/21 3:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Third Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
20 20 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Fri 05/21 3:11 PM
Stipulation (Third) to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph). Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #1. Modified on 5/24/2021 (myt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
19 19 order Stipulation Fri 03/19 11:57 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/19 10:35 AM
Certificate of Service re Second Stipulation and Order to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
17 17 stip Continue Hearing Fri 03/19 10:31 AM
Second Stipulation to Continue Hearing Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 , Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Friday, February 05, 2021
16 16 order Stipulation Fri 02/05 10:37 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 02/05 10:38 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 2/5/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, February 04, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/04 11:05 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
14 14 stip Continue Hearing Thu 02/04 11:02 AM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing re Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
13 13 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 02/04 8:54 AM
Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan of Liquidating Trustee . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/08 3:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Nicholas J. Boos . (myt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/04 11:05 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
10 10 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Fri 12/04 11:03 AM
Stipulation (Second) to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/03 9:04 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Tue 11/03 9:03 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
Monday, October 26, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 10/26 5:43 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This adversary proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on November 19, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the Certificate of Service (Dkt. 7) pertaining to the Summons (Dkt. 3) issued September 23, 2020 and finds that Plaintiff has served Defendant with process in compliance with FRBP 7004(b)(1). Defendant's initial responsive pleading was due on or before October 23, 2020; none has been filed. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) within 14 calendar days following entry of this docket text order, Plaintiff shall request entry of default pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(a); (2) within 30 calendar days following entry of default, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(b)(2); and (3) the scheduling conference is hereby continued to February 11, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 10/26 8:44 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/26/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/29 2:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nicholas J. Boos 9/29/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Discovery Order
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Discovery Order
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 09/23 12:21 PM
Summons Issued on Nicholas J. Boos Answer Due 10/23/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (rs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 order Discovery Wed 09/23 12:16 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (rs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/22 3:55 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03080 . 13 Related [+], 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Nicholas J. Boos. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk modified Statistical Data to reflect the information contained in the PDF. Modified on 9/23/2020 (rs)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet