Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03082
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2020
Terminated:Jul 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Michael Humiston, an individual
2911 Butter Creek Drive
Pasadena, CA 91107
Represented By
David Michael Humiston
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info
Steven T. Gubner
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info
Susan Seflin
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Thursday, July 29, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/29 8:46 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3082. (lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/14 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding [F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)] Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/14 2:35 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Case Management Action due after 07/28/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Wed 07/14 2:39 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The 11/10/21 scheduling conference is off calendar per voluntary dismissal on 7/14/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
23 23 order Stipulation Wed 06/30 3:50 PM
Order Approving Fifth Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/30 1:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Fifth Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
21 21 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 06/30 1:43 PM
Stipulation (Fifth) to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 06/30 3:51 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 6/30/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, April 01, 2021
20 20 order Stipulation Thu 04/01 6:11 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/01 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service of Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
18 18 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 04/01 9:45 AM
Stipulation (Fourth) to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 04/01 6:12 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 4/1/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, January 28, 2021
17 17 order Stipulation Thu 01/28 12:32 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/28 11:36 AM
Certificate of Service of Third Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
15 15 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 01/28 11:32 AM
Stipulation (Third) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 01/28 12:33 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 1/28/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, December 14, 2020
14 14 order Stipulation Mon 12/14 11:48 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/14 10:41 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
12 12 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 12/14 10:36 AM
Stipulation (Second) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph). DEFECTIVE ENTRIES: (1)Incorrect event code selected, (2)Additional event code(s) not selected. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk removed linkage from document #7. Modified on 12/14/2020 (klr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 12/14 11:49 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 12/14/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, October 29, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/29 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Stipulation
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
10 10 order Stipulation Tue 10/27 2:15 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/27 8:54 AM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Tue 10/27 8:43 AM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Monday, October 26, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 10/26 5:54 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This adversary proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on November 19, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the Certificate of Service (Dkt. 7) pertaining to the Summons (Dkt. 2) issued September 23, 2020 and finds that Plaintiff has served Defendant with process in compliance with FRBP 7004(b)(1). Defendant's initial responsive pleading was due on or before October 23, 2020; none has been filed. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) within 14 calendar days following entry of this docket text order, Plaintiff shall request entry of default pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(a); (2) within 30 calendar days following entry of default, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(b)(2); and (3) the scheduling conference is hereby continued to February 11, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The continued scheduling conference will convene via telephone. Please consult the courts website for information concerning the status of court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic and for instructions as to how to arrange an appearance at a telephonic hearing or status conference. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 10/26 8:46 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/26/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/29 2:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Michael Humiston 9/29/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/25 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 09/23 10:27 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (dts)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/23 10:25 AM
Summons Issued on David Michael Humiston Answer Due 10/23/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (dts)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/22 4:08 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03082 . 13 Related [+], 14 Complaint by James Gansman against David Michael Humiston. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet