Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03083
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christina J. Imre
21787 Ventura Blvd. #344
Woodland Hills, CA 91364
Represented By
Christina J. Imre
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/18 4:58 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3083. (rs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/17 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
18 18 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/17 3:31 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 08/31/2021. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
17 17 misc Declaration Wed 02/24 8:40 PM
Declaration of James E. Fitzgerald in Re Statement Required by FRBP 7012 and B.L.R. 7012-1. of . Filed by Defendant Christina J. Imre (Fitzgerald, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
16 16 audio audio Fri 02/19 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/18/2021 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 16527 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:08:50 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/18 6:12 PM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (bg)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Bk) Thu 02/18 2:39 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. James Fitzgerald appeared for the Defendant. There will be a pretrial conference on 4/14/22 at 2:00 p.m. The court will issue an order reflecting the terms discussed on the record. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Friday, February 12, 2021
14 14 misc Declaration Mon 02/15 10:21 AM
Declaration of James E. Fitzgerald Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Christina J. Imre (trw)
Related: [-] 13 Status Conference Statement
13 13 misc Status Conference Statement Mon 02/15 10:19 AM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Christina J. Imre (trw)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued
Thursday, February 11, 2021
12 12 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 02/11 2:10 PM
Status Conference Statement of Trustee and Discovery Plan . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/19 3:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Christina J. Imre . (tm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
10 10 order Stipulation Thu 12/17 11:31 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/17 10:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 12/17 10:13 AM
Stipulation (Second) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 12/17 11:33 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 12/17/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/17 3:51 PM
Christina J. Imre Answer Deadline Reset for 1/19/2021, per (dkt. #10). (dc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
7 7 order Stipulation Wed 10/21 3:50 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond To The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(A) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/21 12:15 PM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue the Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
5 5 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 10/21 12:11 PM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 10/21 3:51 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/21/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/29 2:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christina J. Imre 9/29/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 09/23 9:10 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lj)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/23 9:09 AM
Summons Issued on Christina J. Imre Answer Due 10/23/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/22 4:13 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03083 . 13 Related [+], 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Christina J. Imre. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet