Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03085
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2020
Terminated:Jun 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Frederick A. Smith, III
125 S. Wacker Street Suite 1240
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Frederick A. Smith, III
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/09 10:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/09 10:18 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 06/23/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Wed 06/09 10:24 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The 6/17/21 scheduling conference is off calendar per notice of dismissal on 6/9/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/09 1:54 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3085. (ka)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
26 26 order Stipulation Mon 03/22 3:57 PM
Order Appointing Resolution Advocate And Assignment To The Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation to Appoint Resolution Advocate filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
25 25 order Stipulation Mon 03/22 3:54 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Scheduling Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/22 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph). Related document(s)26 Order on Stipulation. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #26. Modified on 3/23/2021 (lb)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation to Appoint Resolution Advocate
23 23 stip Stipulation to Appoint Resolution Advocate Mon 03/22 2:32 PM
Stipulation to Appoint Michael D. Cooper as Resolution Advocate for the matter concerning Preference/Fraudulent Conveyance Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/22 1:24 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph). Related document(s)25 Order on Stipulation. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #25. Modified on 3/22/2021 (tp)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation to Continue Hearing
21 21 stip Continue Hearing Mon 03/22 1:20 PM
Third Stipulation to Continue Hearing Third stipulation to extend time in which defendant may respond to the complaint and to continue the scheduling conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2021 at 02:00 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
Monday, February 08, 2021
20 20 order Stipulation Mon 02/08 12:45 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/08 11:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
18 18 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 02/08 11:14 AM
Stipulation (Second) to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 02/08 12:51 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 2/8/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, February 04, 2021
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 02/04 2:50 PM
Frederick A. Smith III Answer Deadline Reset for 2/11/2021, per (dkt. #17). (dc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
17 17 order Stipulation Wed 02/03 5:01 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond To TheComplaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 02/03 5:03 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 2/3/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
order Judge Docket Order Tue 02/02 8:00 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding is set to come before the court on February 11, 2021 for a scheduling conference. On January 6, 2021, the parties filed a Stipulation (Dkt. 15), which requested the (a) extension to February 11, 2021 of Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, and (b) the continuance of the February 11 scheduling conference to March 11. The order submitted to chambers with the Stipulation was defective, and was returned to Plaintiff's counsel with instructions regarding its correction and resubmission. To date, Plaintiff's counsel has not resubmitted the order. Accordingly, the court ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel shall submit a corrected order on the Stipulation no later than February 4, 2021. Failure to timely comply with this Docket Text Order will result in the imposition of a sanction in the amount of $250.00 against Plaintiffs counsel. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/06 2:12 PM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
15 15 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 01/06 2:08 PM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: PDF is blank on page 4. Modified on 1/6/2021 (pw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/06 8:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Vacate Entry of Default Against Defendant and Set Related Scheduling Dates and Order Approving Stipulation to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant and Set Related Scheduling Dates Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
13 13 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 01/06 8:48 AM
Stipulation to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant and Set Related Scheduling Dates Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Frederick A. Smith
Thursday, December 24, 2020
misc Document Thu 12/24 8:55 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 11/18/2020 returned as undeliverable. Returned Mail: The following order sent to Frederick A. Smith, III 125 S. Wacker Street Suite 1240 Chicago, IL 60606-4430 on 11/18/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Clerk''s Entry of Default (ADI Administrator court)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
12 12 order Stipulation Tue 11/24 8:32 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Vacate Clerk's Entry Of Default Against Defendant And Set Related Scheduling Dates Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/23 11:11 AM
Certificate of Service re Stipulation to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant and Set Related Scheduling Dates Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
10 10 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 11/23 11:07 AM
Stipulation to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant and Set Related Scheduling Dates Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Frederick A. Smith
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 11/18 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. Notice Date 11/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default
Saturday, November 14, 2020
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Sat 11/14 9:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Frederick A. Smith III Related [+]. (jf)
Related: [-] 5 Request For Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Monday, November 09, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/09 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Frederick A. Smith III and Declaration of Joseph Rothberg In Support Thereof Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Request For Entry of Default,6 Declaration
6 6 misc Declaration Mon 11/09 11:12 AM
Declaration of Joseph Rothberg in In support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Frederick A. Smith III of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Request For Entry of Default
5 5 misc Request For Entry of Default Mon 11/09 11:10 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Re: Against Defendant Frederick A. Smith III Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Clerks Entry of Default due by 11/23/2020. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Service Executed
Monday, October 26, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 10/26 5:59 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This adversary proceeding is scheduled to come before the court on November 19, 2020 for a scheduling conference. The court has reviewed the Certificate of Service (Dkt. 4) pertaining to the Summons (Dkt. 3) issued September 23, 2020 and finds that Plaintiff has served Defendant with process in compliance with FRBP 7004(b)(1). Defendant's initial responsive pleading was due on or before October 23, 2020; none has been filed. Accordingly, the court orders as follows: (1) within 14 calendar days following entry of this docket text order, Plaintiff shall request entry of default pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(a); (2) within 30 calendar days following entry of default, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment pursuant to FRBP 7055/FRCP 55(b)(2); and (3) the scheduling conference is hereby continued to February 11, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The continued scheduling conference will convene via telephone. Please consult the court's website for information concerning the status of court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic and for instructions as to how to arrange an appearance at a telephonic hearing or status conference. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued,4 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 10/26 8:48 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 10/26/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/29 2:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Frederick A. Smith III 9/29/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 09/23 1:28 PM
Summons Issued on Frederick A. Smith III Answer Due 10/23/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (jmb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 order Discovery Wed 09/23 1:19 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (jmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/23 9:17 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03085 . 13 Related [+], 12, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Frederick A. Smith III. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet