Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc. v. Stein Law, P.C. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:20-bk-01418
Lead BK case is: 8:20-bk-01418
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Caryl E Delano |
Case #: | 8:20-ap-00518 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 31, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stein Law, P.C., Defendant
24 Woodbine Avenue Suite 4
Northport, NY 11768 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitchell A Stein, Defendant
Stein Law, P.C. 24 Woodbine Avenue Suite 4
Northport, NY 11768 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc., Plaintiff
215 S. Tessier Drive
Saint Petersburg, FL 33706 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/31 1:49 PM
Adversary Case 8:20-ap-518 Closed. (Vivianne) |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 12/10 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 12/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Thu 12/10 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 12/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
Notice Of Dismissed/Closed Underlying BK Case
Mon 12/07 4:13 PM
Notice of Dismissed Underlying Bankruptcy Case. Bankruptcy Case Dismissed on December 7, 2020 . (Laura G.) |
|
26 | 26
order
Reconsideration
Mon 12/07 4:06 PM
Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case and Adversary Proceedings. . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Laura G.) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Response
Tue 12/01 10:18 AM
Response to Plaintiff's Limited Motion to Reconsider Order Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case and Adversary Proceeding Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C. . (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 11/30 5:33 PM
Limited Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Adversary Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc.. (Etlinger, Daniel) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Wed 11/18 1:21 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Motion to Dispense with Meeting of Parties, Require Production of Insurance and to Set Pretrial Conference Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc.. (Etlinger, Daniel) Doc #20 - Main Case Dismissed Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Sunday, November 15, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 11/16 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
court
Hearing Continued
Fri 11/13 10:31 AM
Hearing Continued from November 16, 2020 at 11:00 am to November 16, 2020 at 3:00 pm. regarding the Motion to Dispense with Meeting of Parties, Require Production of Insurance and to Set Pretrial Conference Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc.. . Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Lisa M.) |
||
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom
Thu 11/12 8:00 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear Via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk) |
|
court
Thu 11/12 1:02 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 11/16/2020 11:00 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dispense with Meeting of Parties, Require Production of Insurance and to Set Pretrial Conference Doc20 . Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. . (Dkt) |
||
Wednesday, November 11, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Wed 11/11 4:02 PM
Motion to Dispense with Meeting of Parties, Require Production of Insurance and to Set Pretrial Conference Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc.. (Etlinger, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 11/11 3:56 PM
Amended Complaint. Reason for Amendment: Additional allegations. Nature of Suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc. against Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. . (Etlinger, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice Of Compliance
Tue 11/03 10:46 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C. . (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Notice of Hearing / Status Conference
Fri 10/30 1:11 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Entered In Error). Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants . Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2020 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Susan B.) Modified on 10/30/2020 (Susan B.) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
court
Thu 10/29 1:09 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 12/14/2020 2:30 pm Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Doc15 . Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. . (Dkt) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Thu 10/29 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 10/28/2020. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/28 8:36 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 10/26 2:47 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Mitchell A Stein for Mitchell A Stein and Stein Law, P.C.. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Robert) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wed 10/21 12:15 PM
Motion of Mitchell A. Stein to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/16 3:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Raye Curry Elliott on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. (Elliott, Raye) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/16 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason L Margolin on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. (Margolin, Jason) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 10/16 2:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven R Wirth on behalf of Defendants Mitchell A Stein, Stein Law, P.C.. (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/29 3:17 PM
Service Executed on Mitchell A. Stein, Esq., Stein Law P.C. and Steven R. Wirth, Esq. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc. . (Etlinger, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Order Granting Motion | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 09/28 12:59 PM
Summons issued on Stein Law, P.C., Mitchell A Stein along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 10/28/2020. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
Seal
Fri 09/25 3:44 PM
Order Granting Motion To File Paper Under Seal (Unrestricted Viewing Allowed.) Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nita) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Motion to File Paper under Seal
Fri 09/25 12:55 PM
Emergency Motion to File Paper Under Seal (Ex Parte) (Unrestricted Viewing Allowed.) Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc.. (Etlinger, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Original
Fri 09/25 12:16 PM
Complaint by Tampa Bay Marine Towing & Service, Inc. against Stein Law, P.C., Mitchell A Stein. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))],[13 ]. (Etlinger, Daniel) |