O'Neal v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81759 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Iowa Northern, 2:20-cv-01038 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 27, 2021 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Inc Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Wed 09/27 8:30 AM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Saturday, August 21, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
8
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Sat 08/21 2:33 PM
Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis, U.S., LLC, filed by Cynthia O'Neal.(Helvey, Larry) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 08/20 12:54 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED) against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., filed by Cynthia O'Neal.(Helvey, Larry) |
|
Saturday, July 10, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Sat 07/10 9:50 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT (DISMISSALS INCLUDED) against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., filed by Cynthia O'Neal.(Helvey, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Wed 01/13 10:04 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Inc Pfizer, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., filed by Cynthia O'Neal.(Helvey, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Wed 09/30 10:29 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 09/28 2:35 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Iowa. Case Number 2:20-cv-01038 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81759-RLR on 9/28/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 09/28 2:31 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 09/28 2:29 PM
Case transferred in from Iowa Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01038. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) MDL No. 2924. This action is transferred to USDC Southern District of Florida and assigned to the Honorable Robin L Rosenberg. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 9/22/2020 (Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Florida) (des) | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (mmc) | |
Att: 1 New Civil Case Packet | ||
Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc) | ||
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3280087.), filed by Cynthia O'Neal. Scheduling Report due by 12/3/2020 (Helvey, Larry) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |