Williams v. Charm-Tex
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Saporito, Jr |
Case #: | 4:20-cv-01776 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 27, 2021 6:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Charm-Tex
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis G. Williams
#28805-018 FCI - Williamsburg SPECIAL MAIL - OPEN ONLY IN THE PRESENCE OF THE INMATE PO Box 340
Salters, SC 29590 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
147 | 147
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/12 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRISONER Case as to144 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry),145 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Dennis G. Williams. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 605 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (dw) |