Gansman v. Egemenoglu et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hannah L Blumenstiel |
Case #: | 3:20-ap-03087 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Egemen Egemenoglu, an individual
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Egemenoglu Hukuk Burosu, a Turkish corporate entity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gansman, Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/19 11:41 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3087. (lm) |
||
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 03/18/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Thu 03/04 12:15 PM
Hearing Dropped The Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal on 3/4/21. The 3/11/21 scheduling conference is off calendar. (bg) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/10/2020 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 3162 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:35 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Thu 12/10 2:18 PM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. No other appearances made. Status statement to be filed 7 days prior to the continued status conference. (bg) |
||
order
Judge Docket Order
Thu 12/10 2:40 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding came before the court on December 10, 2020 for a scheduling conference. For the reasons stated on the record, the court hereby continues the scheduling conference to March 11, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The continued scheduling conference will be conducted via telephone. The court encourages all litigants to consult the court's website for information concerning court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic. The court's website also offers information concerning how to arrange to appear at a telephonic hearing. Should any litigant have questions concerning the status of court operations or how to appear at a telephonic hearing, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the courts website. If there is no indication in the record that would indicate the status of this proceeding prior to the continued scheduling conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall file at least 7 days prior to the continued scheduling conference a short statement advising of the status of the proceeding, which will assist the court in its preparation for the continued scheduling conference. . (Waites, Katie) |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan of Plaintiff . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: PDF is blank on page #5. Modified on 12/3/2020 (lb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed on James Gansman 10/16/2020 and Declaration of Dr. Ziya Akinci, Partner of the Akinci Law Office In Support of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant . (Rothberg, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Egemen Egemenoglu Answer Due 10/30/2020; Egemenoglu Hukuk Burosu Answer Due 10/30/2020 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (aw) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 20-03087 . 11 Complaint by James Gansman against Egemen Egemenoglu, Egemenoglu Hukuk Burosu. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |