Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03088
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Mar 19, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Derin Enerji Uretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Ltd. Sti., a Turkish corporate entity,
Represented By
Derin Enerji Uretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Ltd. Sti.
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust,
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, March 19, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/19 6:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3088. (rs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/04 8:40 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 03/18/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Thu 03/04 12:16 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal on 3/4/21. The 3/11/21 scheduling conference is off calendar. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, December 10, 2020
6 6 audio audio Thu 12/10 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/10/2020 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 3162 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:35 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 12/10 2:19 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Joseph Rothberg appeared for the Plaintiff. No other appearances made. Status statement to be filed 7 days prior to the continued status conference. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
order Judge Docket Order Thu 12/10 2:42 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This proceeding came before the court on December 10, 2020 for a scheduling conference. For the reasons stated on the record, the court hereby continues the scheduling conference to March 11, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The continued scheduling conference will be conducted via telephone. The court encourages all litigants to consult the court's website for information concerning court operations during the COVID-19 pandemic. The court's website also offers information concerning how to arrange to appear at a telephonic hearing. Should any litigant have questions concerning the status of court operations or how to appear at a telephonic hearing, you may contact the court by calling 888-821-7606 or by using the Live Chat feature on the court's website. If there is no indication in the record that would indicate the status of this proceeding prior to the continued scheduling conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall file at least 7 days prior to the continued scheduling conference a short statement advising of the status of the proceeding, which will assist the court in its preparation for the continued scheduling conference. Related [+]. (Waites, Katie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Thursday, December 03, 2020
5 5 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 12/03 2:10 PM
Status Conference Statement and Discovery Plan of Plaintiff . Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/03 2:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Derin Enerji Uretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Ltd. Sti. 11/19/2020 and Declaration of Dr. Ziya Akinci, Partner of the Akinci Law Office In Support of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant . (Rothberg, Joseph) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk modified the docket text to reflect the information contained in the PDF. Modified on 12/3/2020 (lj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 09/30 2:48 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lb)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/30 2:47 PM
Summons Issued on Derin Enerji Uretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Ltd. Sti. Answer Due 10/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 12:27 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03088 . 11 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Derin Enerji Uretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Ltd. Sti.. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet