Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03089
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Apr 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Covenant Consulting, LLC, a Kansas Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Covenant Consulting, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust,
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, April 09, 2021
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/09 8:46 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/09 8:44 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Case Management Action due after 04/23/2021. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Dropped Fri 04/09 9:25 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] The 5/13/21 scheduling conference is off calendar per voluntary dismissal on 4/9/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/09 2:31 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3089. (klr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
19 19 order Stipulation Mon 02/08 12:49 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation To Extend Time In Which Defendant May RespondTo The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To LocalRule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/08 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service of Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
17 17 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 02/08 11:59 AM
Stipulation (Four) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 02/08 12:52 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 2/8/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Monday, January 11, 2021
16 16 order Stipulation Mon 01/11 12:17 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Requesting An Order To Extend Time In WhichDefendant May Respond To The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/11 9:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Third Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
14 14 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 01/11 9:18 AM
Stipulation (Third) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 01/11 12:19 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 1/11/21. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Thursday, December 03, 2020
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/03 3:03 PM
Covenant Consulting, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 1/11/2021, per (dkt. #13). (dc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
13 13 order Stipulation Mon 11/30 3:09 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Requesting An Order To Extend Time In WhichDefendant May Respond To The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/30 11:57 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
11 11 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Mon 11/30 11:54 AM
Stipulation (Second) Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to the Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 11/30 3:14 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 11/30/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
10 10 order Stipulation Wed 11/04 12:58 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Requesting An Order To Extend Time In Which Defendant May Respond To The Complaint And To Continue The Initial Status Conference Pursuant To Local Rule 6-1(a) And Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Related [+]. (bg)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s) filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/04 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Initial Status Conference Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 11/04 11:49 AM
Stipulation Requesting an Order to Extend Time in Which Defendant May Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Status Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001-2 Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman,7 Summons Service Executed
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 11/04 12:59 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Continued per order on 11/4/20. (bg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 10:23 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Covenant Consulting, LLC 10/2/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 10/05 12:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on James Gansman 10/2/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/02 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/02 11:49 AM
Certificate of Service re service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Covenant Consulting, LLC Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Wed 09/30 6:29 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (pw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/30 6:28 PM
Summons Issued on Covenant Consulting, LLC Answer Due 10/30/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (pw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 12:41 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03089 . 12 Related [+] Complaint by James Gansman against Covenant Consulting, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet