Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03100
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark W. Hudson, an individual
15 Robertson Terrace
Mill Valley, CA 94941
Represented By
Mark W. Hudson
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jason B. Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Weber Seror LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, December 07, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/07 8:12 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3100. (dts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/03 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph). Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. Modified on 12/3/2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document(s) #1.(dts)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party
7 7 notice Notice of Plaintiffs Dismissal of Party Thu 12/03 10:20 AM
Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party in Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice . Mark W. Hudson Terminated. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2020 DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected and incorrect PDF attached. (dts)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/19 11:55 AM
Certificate of Service re First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/19 11:53 AM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against Mark W. Hudson. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark W. Hudson 10/6/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Thu 10/01 11:00 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 10:59 AM
Summons Issued on Mark W. Hudson Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/7/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (aw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 4:01 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03100 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Mark W. Hudson. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet