Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03105
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 09, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cynthia H. Plevin, an individual
Represented By
Cynthia H. Plevin
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/09 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/09 11:19 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Settlement Case Management Action due after 12/23/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/09 1:12 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3105. (klr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/22 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service re First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/22 3:47 PM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against Cynthia H. Plevin. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 4:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Cynthia H. Plevin 10/6/2020 . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 03, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/03 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/03/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 01, 2020
3 3 order Discovery Thu 10/01 6:09 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (pw)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 6:08 PM
Summons Issued on Cynthia H. Plevin Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (pw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/30 6:28 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03105 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Cynthia H. Plevin. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet