Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03109
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
W. Bruce Wold, an individual
335 Fairway Drive
Novato, CA 94949
Represented By
W. Bruce Wold
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as the Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, December 07, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/07 11:28 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3109. (lj)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/04 3:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(I)] and Notice of Settlement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/04 3:21 PM
Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Settlement Case Management Action due after 12/18/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk modified docket text. Modified on 12/7/2020 (lj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/23 10:09 AM
Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/23 10:08 AM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against W. Bruce Wold. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added nature of suit(s) to reflect PDF for both Main Case and AP Case. Modified on 10/23/2020 (ka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 3:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on W. Bruce Wold 10/6/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Thu 10/01 1:41 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (aw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 1:40 PM
Summons Issued on W. Bruce Wold Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (aw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 10/01 11:32 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet re Adversary Complaint Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 11:31 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03109 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against W. Bruce Wold. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other