Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03110
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Dec 04, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pamela G McCullough, an individual
134 Short Hills Avenue
Short Hills, NJ 07078
Represented By
Pamela G McCullough
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as liquidating trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, December 04, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/04 2:06 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3110. (rdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/03 10:12 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party
9 9 notice Notice of Plaintiffs Dismissal of Party Thu 12/03 10:11 AM
Notice of Plaintiff's Dismissal of Party in Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice . Pamela G. McCollough Terminated. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/16 10:55 AM
Certificate of Service of First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 15, 2020
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/15 2:44 PM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against Pamela G McCullough. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 12:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pamela G McCullough 10/6/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 03, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/03 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/03/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Discovery Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Thu 10/01 1:25 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (ka)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 1:24 PM
Summons Issued on Pamela G McCullough Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (ka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 10/01 11:39 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet re Adversary Complaint Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 11:38 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03110 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Pamela G McCullough. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other