Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-31087

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:20-ap-03112
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph K. Powers, an individual
3 terrace Drive
Port Washington, NY 11050
Represented By
Joseph K. Powers
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gansman, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the Sedgwick LLP Liquidating Trust
Rock Creek Advisors LLC 555 Fifth Avenue 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Rothberg
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, December 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/11 3:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3112. (ds)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/04 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(I)] and Notice of Settlement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/04 2:18 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Settlement Case Management Action due after 12/18/2020. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/22 3:52 PM
Certificate of Service re First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff James Gansman (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/22 3:51 PM
Amended Complaint (First) by Joseph Rothberg on behalf of James Gansman against Joseph K. Powers. Added the following nature of suit(s): Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy); Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph) Modified on 10/23/2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk modified Statistical Data to reflect the information contained in the PDF. (dts)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/06 2:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Joseph K. Powers 10/6/2020 re Adversary Complaint . (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 4:16 PM
Summons Issued on Joseph K. Powers Answer Due 11/2/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (jmb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
3 3 order Discovery Thu 10/01 4:13 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (jmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 10/01 11:56 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet re Adversary Complaint Related [+]. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Gansman
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 11:55 AM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03112 . 13 Related [+], 11, 14 Complaint by James Gansman against Joseph K Powers. Fee Amount $350. (Rothberg, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other