Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00486
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
James Troupe (1)
Represented By
Daniel J. Misiewicz
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Robert F. Corts
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Marc D. Bullard
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/03/2020 4:38 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/18/20 filed by USA as to James Troupe (1). (D,Ky) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
Arrest of James Troupe (1) on 8/19/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to James Troupe (1). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Daniel J. Misiewicz for James Troupe. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/19/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Initial Appearance as to James Troupe (1) held on 8/19/2020. All parties appeared via video/telephone conference. Marc Bullard present as counsel for the government. Daniel Misiewicz present and appointed as counsel for the defendant. Also present, Pretrial Services Officer Cassandra Stolarik. Defendant consented to participating via video conference, with no objection from defense counsel or government. Defendant waived his right to a preliminary hearing; waiver executed; the court therefore finds there is sufficient evidence to establish probable cause and this matter is bound over to the grand jury for further proceedings pursuant to any restrictions as set forth in General Order 2020-08. Defendant consented on the record to having Attorney Misiewicz sign the waiver on his behalf. The government moved for detention; the government's motion for detention granted on a temporary basis. Detention Hearing set for 8/24/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Instructions for accessing the video hearing will be emailed to all counsel of record. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter ECRO: C. Woodford. Time: 10 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to James Troupe (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/19/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to James Troupe (1). Detention Hearing set for 8/24/2020 at 01:30 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/19/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by James Troupe (1). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
6 6 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Marc D. Bullard appearing for USA. (Bullard, Marc) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Detention Hearing as to James Troupe (1) held on 8/24/2020. AUSA Marc Bullard present for the government. Attorney Daniel Misiewicz present for defendant. As a result of the COVID-19 pandemic, all parties appeared by, and consented to, proceeding via videoconference. Proffers made and arguments heard. The Court takes the matter of detention under advisement. Defendant shall remain in custody of U.S. Marshal pending further order of the Court. (Court Reporter: George Staiduhar; Pretrial Officer: Cassandra Stolarik/Pat LaVecchia) (Time: 25 min.) (S,S) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Motion for Extension of Time of 60 days until 11/17/2020 to Indict by United States of America as to James Troupe (1).(Bullard, Marc) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to James Troupe (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/24/2020. (S,S) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
10 10 Order granting government's8 motion for extension of time to indictment until 11/17/20 as to James Troupe (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/25/20. (D,Ky) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to James Troupe (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/25/2020. (S,S) [1:20-mj-09248-WHB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (O,K)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs Indictment filed by USA as to James Troupe (1) count(s) 1-2, 3, 4, 5. (O,K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form with attachment to designation sheet and signature page