Wiley et al v. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-81838 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-04512 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 03, 2021 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dr. Reddys Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L. Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA
|
|
Defendant
Geri-Care
|
|
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rufus Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Wiley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 10/03 11:55 AM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 06/22 2:10 PM
Seventh AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, L. Perrigo Company, Pfizer, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Wockhardt, Ltd., PATHEON MANUFACTURING SERVICES LLC, filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Finken, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 11/18 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy A. Finken on behalf of Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley. Attorney Tracy A. Finken added to party Pamela Wiley(pty:pla), Attorney Tracy A. Finken added to party Rufus Wiley(pty:pla). (Finken, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Service | ||
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 07/02 9:23 AM
Sixth MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandoz, Inc., filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 05/03 10:11 AM
Fifth MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, L. Perrigo Company, Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. Wockhardt, Ltd., filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) Modified Defendants on 5/3/2021 (pcs) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 9:48 AM
Fourth MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geri-Care, filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 02/02 2:42 PM
Third MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 01/19 3:23 PM
Second MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Fri 01/15 3:11 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Apotex Corp., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, L. Perrigo Company, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Wockhardt, Ltd., Geri-Care, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by Rufus Wiley, Pamela Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Administrative Order
Mon 11/02 7:58 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 10/06 3:12 PM
First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., filed by Rufus Wiley, Pamela Wiley.(Silverstein, Jarad) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 10/05 3:25 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:20-cv-04512 with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81838-RLR on 10/5/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
4 | 4
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 10/05 3:10 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 10/05 3:05 PM
Case transferred in from Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04512. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 36): PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1407 TO THESOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 6, 2020, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ROBIN L. ROSENBERG. (va, ) | |
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/16/2020 (bw, ) | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14566809.), filed by Rufus Wiley, Pamela Wiley.(MILLER, ROBERT) Modified on 9/15/2020 (md, ). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley. (md, ) |