IMED Surgical, LLC v. Orthex, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Jonathan Goodman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-24065 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 03, 2021 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Orthex, LLC
|
|
Defendant
OrthoPediatrics Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Dror Paley
|
|
Defendant
Squadron Capital LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
IMED Surgical, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | IMED Surgical Files Federal Lawsuit Against Orthex, Dror Paley, OrthoPediatrics, and Squadron Capital (orthospinenews.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/07/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by IMED Surgical, LLC (Feldman, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Summons Issued as to Orthex, LLC, OrthoPediatrics Corp., Squadron Capital LLC. (pes) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Requiring Amended Complaint re1 Complaint, filed by IMED Surgical, LLC. ( Amended Complaint due by 10/16/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Orthex, LLC, OrthoPediatrics Corp. and Squadron Capital, LLC by IMED Surgical, LLC (Feldman, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to Dror Paley. (pes) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/6/2020) (pes) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael P. Hogan, mailing date October 6, 2020, (pt) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Orthex, LLC, Dror Paley, OrthoPediatrics Corp. and Squadron Capital, LLC by IMED Surgical, LLC (Feldman, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE by IMED Surgical, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Feldman, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Tue 10/06 9:38 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 10/06 9:37 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13638083, filed by IMED Surgical, LLC.(Feldman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |