JOHNSON et al v. PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy Criswell Wiegand |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01493 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
DOES NO. 1-20
|
|
Defendant
THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. INCENTIVE SAVINGS PLAN ADMINSTRATIVE COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARBARA DEMPS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HENRENA JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
161 | 161
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/29 12:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees by Defendants PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al. On 6/21/2024, this Court granted Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and, pursuant to Rule 58, entered judgment in their favor. ECF Nos. 153, 154, 155. As the prevailing parties, Defendants are entitled to seek an award of attorney's fees. Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d). On 7/22/2024, Plaintiff appealed the grant of summary judgment to the Third Circuit. ECF No. 158. Based on Local Civil Rules, Defendants now have 30 days after the Third Circuit issues its mandate or the appeal is withdrawn to file a motion for attorney's fees. LCvR 54(B)(2). Therefore, Defendants seek to extend their deadline to file for attorney's fees based on Plaintiff's appeal. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the160 Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants shall file any motion for attorney's fees no later than 30 days after either (i) the Third Circuit issues its mandate on appeal, or (ii) the appeal is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/29/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
160 | 160
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 07/26 3:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees by THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. INCENTIVE SAVINGS PLAN ADMINSTRATIVE COMMITTEE. (Sharbaugh, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
159 | 159
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned)
Wed 07/24 2:43 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2348 for158 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN MCCAULEY. USCA Case Manager Alicia (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (ca3amr) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
158 | 158
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required)
Mon 07/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to153 Memorandum Opinion,155 Rule 58 Judgment,154 Order, Terminate Motions, by JOHN MCCAULEY. Filing fee $605, receipt number APAWDC-8367815. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Shah, James) |