Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-34105

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:20-ap-03127
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2020
Terminated:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By
FACEBOOK, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Michael Wayne Sebesta
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, February 18, 2021
court Close adversary case Thu 02/18 9:15 AM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3127 closed (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 02/05 11:30 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/05/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 2/3/2021 (Bradden, T.)
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
5 5 order Dismiss adversary case Wed 02/03 10:55 AM
Order dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 2/3/2021 (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] []
Thursday, October 08, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Thu 10/08 11:24 AM
Summons service executed on FACEBOOK, INC. 10/8/2020 (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Wed 10/07 2:07 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/2/2021 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 10/7/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee
2 2 court Summons issued Wed 10/07 2:06 PM
Summons issued on FACEBOOK, INC. Answer Due 11/6/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/06 2:57 PM
Adversary case 20-03127 Complaint by James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee against FACEBOOK, INC.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 14. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A