Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Maria Ellena Chavez-Ruark
Case #: 1:20-bk-19282
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2020
Dismissed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Dec 01, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Satellite Restaurants Inc. Crabcake Factory USA
12000 Coastal Hwy
Ocean City, MD 21842-4701
Represented By
Paul Sweeney
Yumkas, Vidmar, Sweeney & Mulrenin, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Friday, December 03, 2021
303 303 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Sat 12/04 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 302 Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Case
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
302 302 order Discharging Trustee and Closing Case Wed 12/01 7:03 AM
Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Case . (Oliver, Yvette)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/01 7:01 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-12 Closed. (Oliver, Yvette)
Related: [-]