Gibson v. Penn Waste, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher C Conner |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01890 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 07, 2021 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Penn Waste, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Gibson
1916 Franklin Avenue
Harrisburg, PA 17109 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/18 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to14 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Jeffrey Gibson. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 605 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries.(rw) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from COA | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Letter To District Court Clerk
Thu 07/18 11:44 AM
USCA LETTER TO DISTRICT COURT CLERK re: forwarding Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Gibson to District Court(ssp) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Mon 07/08 4:12 PM
ORDER denying13 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/8/2024 (mw) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 07/08 8:38 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Jeffrey Gibson.(cp) |
|
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Wed 12/15 9:51 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey Gibson(King, James) |
|
Att: 1 Clerk's Letter to District Court | ||
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 01/25 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRISONER Case as to7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Jeffrey Gibson. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Motion for IFP PENDING. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (mw) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/25 11:22 AM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall accept and process Gibsons filing (Doc.8 ) as a notice of appeal. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/25/2021. (mw) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/21 9:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jeffrey Gibson.(rw) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 12/30 12:39 PM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Saporitos report (Doc. 6) is ADOPTED. Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Any appeal from this order is deemed to be frivolous and not taken in good faith. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/30/2020. (mw) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 12/10 12:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) filed by Jeffrey Gibson. Accordingly, it is recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/10/20. (ms) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
order
Verbal Order Reassigning Case
Wed 12/09 2:17 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Christopher C. Conner and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc) |
||
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 11/05 3:00 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) is GRANTED. Service of the complaint however, shall be held in abeyance pending the required screening pending the required screening of the complaint under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 11/5/20 (ga) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/05 2:54 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that planiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The plaintiff shall file his response to this Order within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 11/5/20. (ga) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Practice Order (Use Only in Non-Prisoner Pro Se Cases)
Wed 10/14 11:37 AM
Pro Se Letter issued; (ep) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 10/14 11:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Gibson.(ep) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP)
Wed 10/14 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Penn Waste, Inc. lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jeffrey Gibson.(ep) |