Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50923
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:May 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
DNOW L.P.
7402 N. Eldridge Parkway
Houston, TX 77041
Represented By
DNOW L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Sean Matthew Beach
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/05 9:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50923 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/04 4:52 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 5:02 PM
Notice of Service Notice of Service Regarding Welded's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 10:38 AM
Notice of Service of Defendant DNOW L.P.'s Initial Disclosures Filed by DNOW L.P. (DeBaecke, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/04 1:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by DNOW L.P. Mediation due date: 05/4/2021.(DeBaecke, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:42 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 10:19 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
8 8 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 3:23 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 12:59 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
6 6 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:54 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for 1/7/20 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
5 5 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 11/10 3:55 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Plaintiff Welded Construction, L.P.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-] ument1 ,2
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/10 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 12:15 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50923 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10010695, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibit Tue 10/20 12:14 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 12:05 PM
Adversary case 20-50923 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against DNOW L.P.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Beach, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A