Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50925
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Aug 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blasting Services, Inc.
2379 Lanier Road
Rockville, VA 23146
Represented By
Blasting Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/04 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50925 Closed (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/03 3:06 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
23 23 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Fri 07/16 1:48 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 09/14/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/21 10:17 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Blasting Services Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/20 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, May 17, 2021
20 20 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Mon 05/17 1:39 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 7/19/2021. Signed on 5/17/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Mon 05/17 10:11 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Blasting Services Inc. . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/27 4:19 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) Filed by Blasting Services, Inc. (Niederman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Service Wed 04/21 8:15 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Combined Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents And Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff Filed by Blasting Services, Inc. (Niederman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:20 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/26 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Blasting Services, Inc.. (Niederman, Seth)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, January 25, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/25 5:15 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Blasting Services, Inc. Mediation due date: 05/25/2021. (Niederman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/11 2:57 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 1/11/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 01/11 10:31 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/06 12:21 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 1/6/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
10 10 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 01/06 9:41 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:25 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Blasting Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:28 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50925 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:03 PM
Adversary case 20-50925 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Blasting Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives