Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50931
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jan 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Horizon Supply Company
311 White Street
New Castle, PA 16101
Represented By
Horizon Supply Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/18 11:41 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/18 3:28 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50931 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
24 24 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Mon 12/13 12:34 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
23 23 court Mediator Report Past Due Fri 10/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Service Thu 08/12 5:04 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Horizon Supply Company's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admission Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 07/13 12:38 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/16 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, May 13, 2021
19 19 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Thu 05/13 9:46 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 7/13/2021. Signed on 5/13/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
18 18 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 05/12 11:22 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Horizon Supply Company . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/03 9:13 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TORESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUEST Related [+] Order Signed on 5/3/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 29, 2021
16 16 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 04/29 6:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 29, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/29 6:49 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TORESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Order Signed on 3/29/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 03/29 4:50 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index A
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:24 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/11 6:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Horizon Supply Company Mediation due date: 05/11/2021.(Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service with service list
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 11:51 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/14 9:37 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/14/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, December 11, 2020
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 12/11 11:47 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Horizon Supply Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50931 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:39 PM
Adversary case 20-50931 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Horizon Supply Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives