Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50934
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Mar 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc.
821 Stimmel Road
Columbus, OH 43223
Represented By
Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/09 9:11 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50934 Closed. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/08 2:53 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/05 3:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc. Mediation due date: 06/7/2021.(Miller, Evan)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 04, 2021
12 12 cmp Alias Summons Thu 02/04 2:26 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/5/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/06 12:22 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 1/6/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
10 10 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 01/06 9:49 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:01 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50934 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:51 PM
Adversary case 20-50934 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Kirk Excavating & Construction Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives