Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50935
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lunda Construction Company
620 Gebhardt Road
Black River Falls, WI 54615
Represented By
Lunda Construction Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/14 10:31 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50935 Closed (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/13 10:32 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
23 23 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Mon 06/14 4:14 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Service Mon 05/17 10:07 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Lunda Construction Company's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/16 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, May 13, 2021
20 20 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Thu 05/13 1:18 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 7/13/2021. Signed on 5/13/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 05/13 10:59 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Lunda Construction Company . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Service Wed 05/12 1:18 PM
Notice of Service of Lunda Construction Company's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Filed by Lunda Construction Company (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Service Fri 03/19 12:35 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Lunda Construction Company's First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:25 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service Wed 02/24 11:56 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests Directed to Plaintiff Filed by Lunda Construction Company (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/10 4:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Lunda Construction Company Mediation due date: 06/10/2021.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 14, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/14 4:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 01/14 1:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:02 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/07 11:19 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/7/2020. (DRG)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, December 03, 2020
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 12/03 6:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Lunda Construction Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50935 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:55 PM
Adversary case 20-50935 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Lunda Construction Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives