Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50937
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
MAXX HDD, LLC
7410 Continental Parkway
Amarillo, TX 49119
Represented By
MAXX HDD, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/14 8:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50937 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/13 10:33 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
18 18 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Mon 06/28 5:01 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/29 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Mon 04/26 1:27 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 6/28/2021. Signed on 4/26/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
15 15 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Fri 04/23 3:37 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and MAXX HDD, LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Service Fri 03/19 10:11 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to MAXX HDD, LLC's First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:27 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 28, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Service Sun 02/28 10:44 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests Directed to Plaintiff Filed by MAXX HDD, LLC (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:04 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/23 8:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by MAXX HDD, LLC Mediation due date: 04/22/2021.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
5 5 motion Stipulation Thu 12/10 5:17 PM
Stipulation Between MAXX HDD, LLC and Plaintiff Welded Construction, L.P. Extending Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by MAXX HDD, LLC. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant MAXX HDD, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50937 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 2:04 PM
Adversary case 20-50937 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against MAXX HDD, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives