Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50938
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Mar 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc.
250 Park Road
Apollo, PA 15613
Represented By
McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 21, 2022
29 29 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/21 1:11 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/21 11:44 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/21 3:59 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50938 Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
27 27 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Thu 12/16 2:20 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
26 26 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
25 25 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 11/17 10:09 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
24 24 court Mediator Report Past Due Mon 11/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
23 23 court Mediator Report Past Due Fri 10/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
22 22 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 09/16 12:17 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
21 21 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Service Fri 08/27 3:54 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 15, 2021
19 19 court Mediator Report Past Due Sun 08/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
18 18 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 07/21 11:18 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
17 17 court Mediator Report Past Due Thu 07/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/01 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
15 15 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Wed 04/28 2:31 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 6/28/2021. Signed on 4/28/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 04/28 11:20 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc. . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 17, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/18 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, April 15, 2021
12 12 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Thu 04/15 9:45 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Joseph Grey is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 6/15/2021. Signed on 4/15/2021. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:28 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
8 8 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 3:21 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
6 6 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/10 4:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/9/2021.(Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50938 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 2:08 PM
Adversary case 20-50938 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against McCutcheon Enterprises, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives