Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50941
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jun 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Off Duty Services, Inc.
1908 Avenue D, A100
Katy, TX 77493
Represented By
Off Duty Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, June 24, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/24 10:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50941 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/23 1:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
15 15 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Fri 05/21 4:57 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 07/20/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/16 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, May 13, 2021
13 13 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Thu 05/13 9:40 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 7/13/2021. Signed on 5/13/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
12 12 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 05/12 4:58 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Off Duty Services, Inc. . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:29 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/11 1:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Off Duty Services, Inc. Mediation due date: 05/11/2021.(Mersky, Rachel)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:09 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:11 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Off Duty Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:11 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50941 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 2:20 PM
Adversary case 20-50941 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Off Duty Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives