Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50944
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC
2800 E. Vernon Road
Rosebush, MI 48878
Represented By
R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/16 2:53 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50944 Closed (DRG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/15 4:32 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
17 17 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Wed 07/14 2:34 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 09/13/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
16 16 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 06/01 2:38 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service Thu 04/22 10:50 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/03 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
13 13 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Wed 03/31 1:13 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 5/31/2021. Signed on 3/31/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 03/31 9:56 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:33 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
8 8 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:11 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
6 6 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/30 9:30 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC Mediation due date: 03/30/2021.(Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:16 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50944 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 2:35 PM
Adversary case 20-50944 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against R-Value Foam Insulation, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives